California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:25-cv-01969
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 2:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Jogo Studios, Inc.
Represented By
Erica J. Van Loon
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Defendant
Andre Rebelo-Soares
Represented By
Erica J. Van Loon
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MM Games d.o.o.
Represented By
Dylan J Harlow
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Kayla 'A. Ganir
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
J. Michael Keyes
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Connor J. Hansen
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Kent J. Schmidt
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
37 37 misc Miscellaneous Document Tue 04/15 12:49 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) (REPLACEMENT OF DOCKET #25) filed by Defendants Jogo Studios, Inc., Andre Rebelo-Soares re: Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,,35 (Van Loon, Erica)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Miscellaneous Document Tue 04/15 12:47 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) (REPLACEMENT OF DOCKET #24) filed by Defendants Jogo Studios, Inc., Andre Rebelo-Soares re: Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,,35 (Van Loon, Erica)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
35 35 order Leave to File Document Under Seal Tue 04/15 10:28 AM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following documents shall be retroactively and permanently sealed pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5: 1. The unredacted version of Plaintiff's Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint ("Request," ECF No. 24); and 2. The Court's 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint ("Summons," ECF No. 25). The Clerk of Court shall immediately, retroactively, and permanently seal the Request and Summons (ECF Nos. 24 and 25) to remove the personal home address of Defendant Andre Rebelo-Soares from the public docket. Counsel for Defendants shall file the Request and Summons (ECF Nos. 24 and 25) with the proposed redacted versions forthwith.; granting34 EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document under seal. (aco)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Leave to File Document Under Seal Mon 04/14 11:41 AM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Jogo Studios, Inc., Andre Rebelo-Soares.(Van Loon, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Erica Van Loon,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
33 33 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/09 10:52 AM
ORDER by Judge George H Wu: granting31 Non-Resident Attorney Kayla 'A. Ganir APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o., designating Kent J. Schmidt as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
32 32 order Extending Answer Due Deadline ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/09 10:08 AM
ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS by Judge George H Wu. Having considered the Stipulation, the Court hereby Orders, based on a showing of good cause, the following: 1. Defendants' time to file a response to the Complaint is extended to May 14, 2025. 2. Defendants' deadline to file an opposition to Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction Motion is May 14, 2025. 3. Plaintiff's deadline to file a reply, in support of its Preliminary Injunction Motion is May 21, 2025. 4. The hearing on Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction Motion shall be continued from May 8, 2025 to June 5, 2025 at 8:30 a.m. RE: Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response,30 . (aco)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 04/08 4:20 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kayla 'A.Ganir to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39467901) filed by Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o.. (Schmidt, Kent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
30 30 stip Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/08 11:42 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement 29 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Jogo Studios, Inc., Andre Rebelo-Soares.(Attorney Erica J. Van Loon added to party Jogo Studios, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Erica J. Van Loon added to party Andre Rebelo-Soares(pty:dft))(Van Loon, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
29 29 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 04/02 12:46 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement filed by Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o.. Motion set for hearing on 5/8/2025 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Keyes, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of Justin Lewis,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, March 28, 2025
28 28 order Leave to File Excess Pages Mon 03/31 11:34 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IN EXCESS OF THE 7,000 WORD COUNT LIMIT by Judge George H Wu. Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o.'s Ex Parte Application for leave to file a Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction in excess of the 7,000 word limit is granted. With good cause appearing, Plaintiff may file a memorandum of points and authorities in support of its motion for preliminary injunction up to 9,375 words.; granting27 APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Exceed 7000 Word Count Limit. (aco)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Exceed Page Limitation Fri 03/28 12:56 PM
APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Exceed 7000 Word Count Limit as to Memorandum of Point & Authorities in Support Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o.. (Keyes, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
26 26 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 03/28 12:17 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o., upon Defendant Jogo Studios, Inc. served on 3/24/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Keyes, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
25 25 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 03/27 2:07 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Andre Rebelo-Soares. (aco)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Summons Request Thu 03/27 1:46 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o.. (Keyes, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
23 23 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Mon 03/24 1:56 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Exceed Word Limintation for Motion for Preliminary Injunction6 by Judge George H Wu. Docket No. 6 is stricken for the reason(s) stated in the Notice22 filed on March 24, 2025. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 03/24 11:40 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Exceed Word Limintation for Motion for Preliminary Injunction6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
Related: [-]
21 21 10 pgs order Order Mon 03/24 10:40 AM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
20 20 2 pgs adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 03/20 2:12 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Thu 03/20 2:11 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Judge George H Wu for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:25-cv-01969-GW (JPRx). (et)
Related: [-]
18 18 textonly MJDAP Timely Opt-Out Thu 03/20 12:44 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Declination of Consent form received on 3/19/2025 was submitted within deadline set forth in L.R. 73-2.1. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
17 17 2 pgs notice Summons Request Wed 03/19 2:15 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o.. (Keyes, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
16 16 2 pgs service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/12 4:15 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Jogo Studios, Inc. (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/11 3:59 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting11 Non-Resident Attorney Dylan J. Harlow's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o., designating Kent J. Schmidt as local counsel. (hr)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/11 3:57 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting10 Non-Resident Attorney Connor J. Hansen's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o., designating Kent J. Schmidt as local counsel. (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
13 13 2 pgs notice Summons Request Mon 03/10 5:20 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o.. (Keyes, J.)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Summons Request Mon 03/10 5:19 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o.. (Keyes, J.)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 03/10 5:14 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dylan J. Harlow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39268283) filed by Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o.. (Schmidt, Kent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 03/10 4:59 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Connor J. Hansen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39268092) filed by Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o.. (Schmidt, Kent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 07, 2025
9 9 1 pgs attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Fri 03/07 1:11 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Dylan Harlow. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
Related: [-]
8 8 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Fri 03/07 1:10 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Cannor J. Hansen. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Fri 03/07 1:08 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
6 6 motion Exceed Page Limitation Thu 03/06 3:34 PM
APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Exceed Word Limintation for Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o.. (Keyes, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 220 pgs Exhibit A
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/06 2:37 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o. (Keyes, J.)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Thu 03/06 2:33 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by MM Games d.o.o.. (Keyes, J.)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/06 2:27 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o.. (Keyes, J.)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Lodging Thu 03/06 2:23 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed NONPAPER EXHIBIT PURSUANT TO L.R. 11-5.1 - EXHIBIT C re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 (Keyes, J.)
Related: [-]
1 1 35 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/06 2:17 PM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($405 paid on 03/06/2025, receipt number 39244127), filed by Plaintiff MM Games d.o.o.. (Attorney J. Michael Keyes added to party MM Games d.o.o.(pty:pla))(Keyes, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit D