Member Case
Lead case is: 1:25-bk-40464

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Nancy Hershey Lord
Case #: 1:25-bk-41127
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
385 Greenwich Street LLC
3131 Bedford Ave
Brooklyn, NY 11210-3723
Represented By
Kevin J Nash
Goldberg Weprin Finkel Goldstein LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 6:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Consolidation and Amend Caption Thu 04/24 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Consolidation and Amend Caption Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
court Entry Tue 04/22 10:42 AM
An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the joint administration of In re: ZRG, Inc. 25-40464 nhl with Member Cases: 90 Nassau Street LLC, 25-41126 nhl and 385 Greenwich Street LLC, 25-41127 nhl. The case docket in Case No. 25-40464 nhl (ZRG, Inc.) should be consulted for all matters affecting the above listed cases (drk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
33 33 order Joint Administration Mon 04/21 2:03 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case: ZRG, Inc. 25-40464 nhl with Member Cases: 90 Nassau Street LLC 25-41126 nhl and 385 Greenwich Street LLC 25-41127 nhl Related [+]. Signed on 4/21/2025. (drk)
Related: [-] 14
32 32 order Authorizing Retention of Attorney (Ch11) Mon 04/21 11:15 AM
Order Authorizing Retention of Chapter 11 Attorney Goldberg Weprin Finkel Goldstein LLP Effective as of the Filing of the Chapter 11 Petition by ZRG Inc. (Case No. 25-40464 on January 29, 2025 Related [+]. Signed on 4/21/2025 (drk)
Related: [-] 16 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 385 Greenwich Street LLC
Friday, April 18, 2025
31 31 8 pgs order Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens under 11 U.S.C. 363(f) Fri 04/18 4:54 PM
Order Authorizing and Approving the Sale of the Debtor's Real Property located at 385 Greenwich Street, New York, NY with Assumption and Assignment of Existing Leases and otherwise Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Interest. Related [+] Signed on 4/18/2025. (jag)
Related: [-] 8
30 30 order Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Fri 04/18 4:39 PM
Order Establishing Deadline for Filing Proofs of Claim. Signed on 4/18/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 6/17/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 7/28/2025. (jag)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
29 29 misc Affidavit Wed 04/02 10:10 AM
Affidavit Re: Declaration of Disinterestness by Gregory Spatz Filed by Jay B Solomon on behalf of Gregory Spatz (Solomon, Jay)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
28 28 misc Letter Tue 04/01 12:27 AM
Letter re: Declaration of Zachary Gindi Filed by James Vincequerra on behalf of Ladder CRE Finance REIT Inc, as successor-in-interest to Ladder Capital Finance LLC Related [+] (Vincequerra, James)
Related: [-] 26 Declaration filed by Interested Party 385G LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit A1
Att: 2 Exhibit A2
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Att: 5 Exhibit D
27 27 misc Letter Tue 04/01 12:20 AM
[ENTERED IN ERROR AS INCOMPLETE AS PER FILER - PLEASE SEE CORRECT ENTRY BELOW AT ECF#28 Letter re: Declaration of Zachary Gindi Filed by James Vincequerra on behalf of Ladder CRE Finance REIT Inc, as successor-in-interest to Ladder Capital Finance LLC Related [+] (Vincequerra, James)Modified on 4/1/2025 (agh)
Related: [-] 26 Declaration filed by Interested Party 385G LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit A1
Att: 2 Exhibit A2
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Att: 5 Exhibit D
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Tue 04/15 8:34 AM
Hearing Held; Appearances: Elizabeth Murphy, Joseph Natt, James Vincequerra, William Hao (Counsel to Ladder CRE Finance REIT Incs),Kevin J. Nash (Counsel to Debtor), Shannon Anne Scott (Office of the US Trustee), Alexander Colaitis (Interested Party), Moshe Sasson (Interested Party), Jay B. Solomon (Counsel to Gregory Spatz);and Adjourned; Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 05/20/2025 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 3 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Tue 04/15 8:35 AM
Hearing Held; Appearances: Elizabeth Murphy, Joseph Natt, James Vincequerra, William Hao (Counsel to Ladder CRE Finance REIT Incs),Kevin J. Nash (Counsel to Debtor), Shannon Anne Scott (Office of the US Trustee), Alexander Colaitis (Interested Party), Moshe Sasson (Interested Party), Jay B. Solomon (Counsel to Gregory Spatz); Sale Confirmed as per the record; Circulate and Submit Order. Related [+] (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens under 11 U.S.C 363(f) filed by 385 Greenwich Street LLC,10 Order to Schedule Hearing (Generic)
Monday, March 31, 2025
26 26 misc Declaration Mon 03/31 9:11 PM
Declaration Filed by Jason Louis Libou on behalf of 385G LLC (Libou, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
25 25 misc Statement Thu 03/27 6:10 PM
Statement /Notice of Auction Transcript. Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 385 Greenwich Street LLC Related [+] (Donovan, J)
Related: [-] 18 Order to Schedule Hearing (Generic)
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
24 24 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Wed 03/26 1:58 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Declaration of Service for Amended Petition Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 385 Greenwich Street LLC Related [+] (Donovan, J)
Related: [-] 15 Refiled Petition Re: Forms Modernization 2015 (Pgs 1-4) for Non-Individuals filed by Debtor 385 Greenwich Street LLC, Statement
23 23 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Wed 03/26 9:27 AM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 385 Greenwich Street LLC Related [+] (Donovan, J)
Related: [-] 16 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 385 Greenwich Street LLC,17 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor 385 Greenwich Street LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Wed 03/26 10:23 AM
Hearing Held; ; Appearances: Kevin J Nash and J. Ted Donovan (Counsel to Debtor), Sylvia Shweder (Office of the US Trustee), James Vincequerra (Counsel to Ladder CRE Finance REIT Inc.), Alexander Colaitis (Interested Party), Moshe Sasson (Interested Party);and Adjourned; Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 04/01/2025 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 3 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Wed 03/26 10:27 AM
Hearing Held; Appearances: Kevin J Nash and J. Ted Donovan (Counsel to Debtor), Sylvia Shweder (Office of the US Trustee), James Vincequerra (Counsel to Ladder CRE Finance REIT Inc.), Alexander Colaitis (Interested Party), Moshe Sasson (Interested Party);and Adjourned; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 04/01/2025 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens under 11 U.S.C 363(f) filed by 385 Greenwich Street LLC,10 Order to Schedule Hearing (Generic)
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
22 22 answer Objection Tue 03/25 10:16 PM
Objection Filed by Jay B Solomon on behalf of Gregory Spatz Related [+] (Solomon, Jay)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens under 11 U.S.C 363(f) filed by Debtor 385 Greenwich Street LLC
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Gregory Spatz in Support of Objection
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Spatz Qualified Bid
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - 385G LLC Proposed Contract of Sale
Att: 4 Affidavit Certificate of Service
21 21 misc Declaration Tue 03/25 6:46 PM
Declaration Filed by Kevin J Nash on behalf of 385 Greenwich Street LLC Related [+] (Nash, Kevin)
Related: [-] 18 Order to Schedule Hearing (Generic)
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 03/25 5:31 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jay B Solomon on behalf of Gregory Spatz (Solomon, Jay)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
19 19 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Mon 03/24 9:26 AM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Kevin J Nash on behalf of 385 Greenwich Street LLC Related [+] (Nash, Kevin)
Related: [-] 18 Order to Schedule Hearing (Generic)
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
18 18 order Schedule Hearing (Generic) Wed 03/19 4:10 PM
Order Approving Bidding Procedures for the Sale of the Debtors Property at 385 Greenwich Street, New York, NY With Assumption And Assignment of Existing Leases and Otherwise Free and Clear Of Liens, Claims, Interests and Non-permitted Encumbrances. The Debtor is hereby authorized to conduct an auction sale of the Property on March 25, 2025 at 3:00 p.m. in accordance with the Bidding Procedures Related [+]. Signed on 3/19/2025. Video Hearing to confirm auction Hearing scheduled for 3/26/2025 at 09:00 AM before the Honorable Judge Nancy Lord. (drk)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens under 11 U.S.C 363(f)
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
17 17 motion Joint Administration Tue 03/18 5:58 PM
Motion for Joint Administration of Case 25-40464 NHL with Case(s) 25-40464 NHL; 25-41126 NHL; 25-41127 NHL ZRG, Inc., 90 Nassau Street LLC, and 385 Greenwich Street LLC Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 385 Greenwich Street LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/29/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (Donovan, J)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Employ (Application) Tue 03/18 5:49 PM
Application to Employ Goldberg Weprin Finkel Goldstein LLP as Counsel for the Debtors ZRG, Inc., 90 Nassau Street LLC, and 385 Greenwich Street LLC . Objections to be filed on 04/7/2025. Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 385 Greenwich Street LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/15/2025 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY.Order to be presented for signature on 4/14/2025. (Donovan, J)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Refiled Petition Re: Forms Modernization 2015 (Pgs 1-4) for Non-Individuals Tue 03/18 4:48 PM
Refiled Petition Re: Forms Modernization 2015 (Pgs 1-4)for Non-Individuals; Attorney's Information, Amended Statement to Local Rule for Disclosure Concerning Related Cases Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 385 Greenwich Street LLC (Donovan, J)
Related: [-]
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Mon 03/24 10:49 AM
Initial Case Management Hearing Held; Appearances: Kevin J Nash (Counsel to Debtor), Nazar Khodorovsky (Office of the US Trustee), James Vincequerra (Counsel to Ladder CRE Finance REIT Inc.); and Adjourned; Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 03/26/2025 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 3 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Mon 03/24 10:52 AM
Hearing Held; Appearances: Kevin J Nash (Counsel to Debtor), Nazar Khodorovsky (Office of the US Trustee), James Vincequerra (Counsel to Ladder CRE Finance REIT Inc.); Bid procedures approved as per the record; Order Entered; Hearing to Confirm Sale scheduled for 03/26/2025 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens under 11 U.S.C 363(f) filed by 385 Greenwich Street LLC,10 Order to Schedule Hearing (Generic)
Monday, March 17, 2025
14 14 motion Joint Administration Mon 03/17 6:09 PM
Motion for Joint Administration of Case 25-40464 with Case(s) 25-41126 25-41127 Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 385 Greenwich Street LLC. (Donovan, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 motion Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Mon 03/17 6:07 PM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 385 Greenwich Street LLC. (Donovan, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Notice
Att: 2 Proposed Order
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 03/17 3:01 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by James Vincequerra on behalf of Ladder CRE Finance REIT Inc, as successor-in-interest to Ladder Capital Finance LLC (Vincequerra, James)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Mon 03/17 11:38 AM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 385 Greenwich Street LLC Related [+] (Donovan, J)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens under 11 U.S.C 363(f) filed by Debtor 385 Greenwich Street LLC,10 Order to Schedule Hearing (Generic)
Friday, March 14, 2025
10 10 order Schedule Hearing (Generic) Fri 03/14 11:48 AM
Order Scheduling Hearings on Shortened Notice To Consider the Debtors Sale Procedures Motion And Confirm the Auction Results. Notice of the Sale Procedures Hearing shall be sufficient if a copy of this Order and the Sale Procedures Motion are sent by email where known and otherwise by overnight on or before March 14, 2025 Related [+]. Signed on 3/14/2025. Video Hearing scheduled for 3/18/2025 at 11:30 AM before the Honorable Judge Nancy Lord. (drk)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens under 11 U.S.C 363(f) filed by Debtor 385 Greenwich Street LLC
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Fri 03/14 9:39 AM
Receipt of Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens under 11 U.S.C 363(f)([LINK:1 25-41127 nhl] ) [motion,msfcl] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23432739. Fee amount 199.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#8
Thursday, March 13, 2025
9 9 motion Limit Notice Thu 03/13 5:28 PM
Motion to Limit Notice Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 385 Greenwich Street LLC Related [+]. (Donovan, J)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens under 11 U.S.C 363(f) filed by Debtor 385 Greenwich Street LLC
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 0 pgs motion Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens under 11 U.S.C 363(f) (Fee Due) Thu 03/13 5:26 PM
Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens under 11 U.S.C 363(f) 385 Greenwich Street, New York, NY . Fee Amount $199. Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 385 Greenwich Street LLC. (Donovan, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Thu 03/13 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 03/12/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 09, 2025
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Mon 03/10 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 03/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Mon 03/10 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 03/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
4 4 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee Fri 03/07 4:10 PM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/7/2025 at 02:00 PM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (866) 919-4760, Participant Code 4081400, Enter # sign. (Sussman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges Fri 03/07 2:09 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Signed on 3/7/2025. Video Status hearing to be held on 3/18/2025 at 11:30 AM before the Honorable Judge Nancy Lord. (drk)
Related: [-]
court Case Related to a Chapter 11 Fri 03/07 7:36 AM
The above case is related to Case Number(s) 25-41126 nhl, 90 Nassau Street LLC; 25-40464 nhl: ZRG, Inc. (nwh)
Related: [-]
utility Judge Reassignment Utility Fri 03/07 7:37 AM
Judge Elizabeth S. Stong removed from the case due to Related Case, Judge Reassigned. Judge Nancy Hershey Lord added to the case. (nwh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
2 2 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Fri 03/07 9:01 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 3/6/2025. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 3/6/2025. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 3/20/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 3/20/2025. (drk)
Related: [-]
1 1 31 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 03/06 5:04 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Kevin J Nash on behalf of 385 Greenwich Street LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/7/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 07/7/2025. (Nash, Kevin)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Thu 03/06 5:21 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1 25-41127 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23411104. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1