Colorado District Court
Judge:Regina M Rodriguez
Referred: Kathryn A Starnella
Case #: 1:25-cv-00740
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Case in other court:Jefferson County District Court, 2025CV30211
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 3:39 AM MDT
Defendant
Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.
Represented By
Deanne Campbell Ayers
Ayers & Ayers
contact info
Defendant
Imperium Insurance Company
800 Gessner, Suite 600
Houston, TX 77024
Represented By
Deanne Campbell Ayers
Ayers & Ayers
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacqueline DeQuebec
Represented By
Matthew Carl Gizzi
Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC
contact info
John Vanker O'Grady
Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
29 29 misc Jury Demand Wed 05/07 2:45 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Jacqueline DeQuebec. (O'Grady, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
28 28 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/06 4:13 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 5/6/25. (lgale, )
Related: [-]
27 27 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 05/06 4:12 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 5/6/2025. Discovery due by 3/2/2026. FTR: KAS Courtroom C204. (lgale, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
26 26 order Protective Order Wed 04/30 8:36 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 29 April 2025. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 04/30 8:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 29 April 2025. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation and Joint Motion to Enter Protective Order23 is GRANTED. The Protective Order [#23-1] supplied by the parties is accepted, with the Courts modifications, and entered as an Order of the Court as of the date of this Minute Order.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
24 24 order Order Referring Motion Mon 04/28 11:27 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 23 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Joint Stipulation and Motion) filed by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., Imperium Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 4/28/2025. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
23 23 motion Protective Order Fri 04/25 4:02 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Joint Stipulation and Motion) by Defendants Imperium Insurance Company, Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.. (Ayers, Deanne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
22 22 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 04/24 12:43 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order of the Parties by Defendants Imperium Insurance Company, Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.. (Ayers, Deanne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
21 21 order Protective Order Fri 04/11 8:48 AM
ORDER REGARDING FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(D) by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 10 April 2025. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Stipulation Thu 04/10 4:21 PM
STIPULATION re18 Order Proposed Order Regarding Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) by Defendants Imperium Insurance Company, Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc..(Ayers, Deanne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order
Thursday, April 03, 2025
19 19 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Thu 04/03 3:34 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Imperium Insurance Company, Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Ayers, Deanne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/01 3:33 PM
PRE-SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 1 April 2025. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
17 17 3 pgs order Order Mon 03/17 8:02 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 14 March 2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/29/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2025 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 2 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 3 Continuation of Main Document
Friday, March 07, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 03/07 8:58 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Matthew Gizzi by Matthew Carl Gizzi on behalf of Jacqueline DeQuebecAttorney Matthew Carl Gizzi added to party Jacqueline DeQuebec(pty:pla) (Gizzi, Matthew)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 03/07 8:54 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance John V. O'Grady by John Vanker O'Grady on behalf of Jacqueline DeQuebecAttorney John Vanker O'Grady added to party Jacqueline DeQuebec(pty:pla) (O'Grady, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
14 14 order Order Referring Motion Thu 03/06 5:42 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Imperium Insurance Company, 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 3/6/2025. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 03/06 5:40 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 3/6/2025. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/06 4:19 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. for Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.. (Ayers, Deanne)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 03/06 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Deanne Campbell Ayers on behalf of All Defendants (Ayers, Deanne)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Thu 03/06 4:16 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (agryan)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Case Assigned to Judge Thu 03/06 4:15 PM
Case assigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry (agryan)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 03/06 4:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Cover Sheet, Summons upon Imperium Insurance Company on 02/11/2025. (agryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 03/06 4:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Cover Sheet, Summons upon Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. on 02/11/2025. (agryan)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Complaint Thu 03/06 4:13 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., Imperium Insurance Company, filed by Jacqueline DeQuebec.(agryan)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Thu 03/06 4:12 PM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (agryan)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Removal: Administrative Notices Thu 03/06 4:12 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (agryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 03/06 4:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Imperium Insurance Company. (Ayers, Deanne)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 03/06 4:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.. (Ayers, Deanne)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 03/06 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., Imperium Insurance Company from Jefferson County District Court, Case Number 2025CV30211. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10197872), filed by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., Imperium Insurance Company.(Ayers, Deanne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Attachment 1 List of Attachments,
Att: 2 Appendix Attachment 1-1 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 Appendix Attachment 1-2 Complaint for Damages,
Att: 4 Appendix Attachment 1-3 State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Appendix Attachment 1-4 Summons on Imperium Ins. Co,
Att: 6 Appendix Attachment 1-5 Summons on Gallagher Bassett Services,
Att: 7 Appendix Attachment 1-6 Civil Procedure Order,
Att: 8 Appendix Attachment 1-7 Entry of Appearance of Matthew Gizzi,
Att: 9 Appendix Attachment 1-8 Return of Service on Imperium,
Att: 10 Appendix Attachment 1-9 Return of Service on Gallagher Bassett Services,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet