California Central District Court
Judge:Hernan D Vera
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 2:25-cv-02002
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 2:24 AM PDT
Defendant
North American Breaker Company, LLC
Represented By
Edgar F Navarrete
Mullen Coughlin LLC
contact info
James F Monagle
Mullen Coughlin LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald Swan
Represented By
Ryan D. Maxey
Maxey Law Firm PA
contact info
M Anderson Berry
Clayeo C. Arnold, Aplc
contact info
Gregory Haroutunian
Clayeo Arnold Aplc
contact info
Patrick A. Barthle
Morgan And Morgan Complex Litigation Group
contact info
Brandon Pierce Jack
Clayeo Arnold, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
23 23 order Stipulation and Order Extending Answer Due Deadline Wed 04/09 2:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT, NORTH AMERICAN BREAKER COMPANY, LLC'S, TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT19 by Judge Hernan D. Vera. It is hereby ordered that the Defendant's responsive pleading in response to Plaintiff's Complaint is to be filed on or by May 1, 2025. (lom)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 04/09 11:10 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (wm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
21 21 order Transferring Case (Related Case)(CV-34) Tue 04/08 4:54 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:25-cv-00402-HDV (KESx). Case transferred from Judge Michelle Williams Court and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg to Judge Hernan D. Vera and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:25-cv-02002-HDV (KESx). Signed by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
20 20 notice Related Case(s) Tue 04/01 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Ronald Swan. Related Case(s): 8:25-cv-00402(Berry, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Pilavian Complaint
Thursday, March 27, 2025
19 19 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 03/27 3:17 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to North American Breaker Company, LLC answer now due 5/1/2025, filed by Defendant North American Breaker Company, LLC.(Navarrete, Edgar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
18 18 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 03/25 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant North American Breaker Company, LLC, identifying NORTH AMERICAN BREAKER COMPANY, LLC. (Navarrete, Edgar)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 03/25 4:55 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Edgar F Navarrete counsel for Defendant North American Breaker Company, LLC. Adding Edgar F. Navarrete as counsel of record for NORTH AMERICAN BREAKER COMPANY, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant NORTH AMERICAN BREAKER COMPANY, LLC. (Attorney Edgar F Navarrete added to party North American Breaker Company, LLC(pty:dft))(Navarrete, Edgar)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 03/25 4:19 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James F Monagle counsel for Defendant North American Breaker Company, LLC. Adding James F. Monagle as counsel of record for NORTH AMERICAN BREAKER COMPANY, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant NORTH AMERICAN BREAKER COMPANY, LLC. (Attorney James F Monagle added to party North American Breaker Company, LLC(pty:dft))(Monagle, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
15 15 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/19 11:29 AM
ORDER by Judge Michelle Williams Court: granting13 Non-Resident Attorney Ryan D. Maxey APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Swan, designating M. Anderson Berry as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
14 14 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/19 9:25 AM
ORDER by Judge Michelle Williams Court: granting12 Non-Resident Attorney Patrick A. Barthle APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Swan, designating M. Anderson Berry as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 03/17 9:51 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan D. Maxey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Swan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39318612) filed by Plaintiff Ronald Swan. (Berry, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 03/17 12:59 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Patrick A. Barthle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Swan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39313361) filed by Plaintiff Ronald Swan. (Berry, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 03/12 1:24 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronald Swan, upon Defendant North American Breaker Company, LLC served on 3/11/2025, answer due 4/1/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Koy Saecho-CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service registered as agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Berry, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/10 2:24 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Michelle Williams Court. (ji)
Related: [-]
9 9 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Mon 03/10 9:07 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ryan D. Maxey. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
Related: [-]
8 8 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Mon 03/10 9:06 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Patrick A. Barthle II. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/07 4:27 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant North American Breaker Company, LLC. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/07 4:17 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/07 4:17 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/07 4:16 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michelle Williams Court and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/06 5:38 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ronald Swan, identifying Plaintiff. (Berry, M)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Thu 03/06 5:37 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Ronald Swan. (Berry, M)
Related: [-]
1 1 48 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/06 5:36 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39248528 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Ronald Swan. (Attorney M Anderson Berry added to party Ronald Swan(pty:pla))(Berry, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet