New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 1:25-cv-01886
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 5:56 AM EDT
Defendant
American Northern Marianas Regional Center, LLC
Represented By
Theodore Sigmund Geiger
The Law Office Of Theodore Geiger, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Bridge Investment Group, LLC
Represented By
Bruce Michael Gorman, Jr
Blank Rome Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
James Huang
Represented By
Bruce Michael Gorman, Jr
Blank Rome Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Xianjun Meng
Represented By
Bruce Michael Gorman, Jr
Blank Rome Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Silvia Siu
Represented By
Bruce Michael Gorman, Jr
Blank Rome Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Erik Fangshen Wang
Represented By
Theodore Sigmund Geiger
The Law Office Of Theodore Geiger, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tianyi Wei
Represented By
Preston James Postlethwaite
The Postlethwaite Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Tom M. Fini
Catafago Fini LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
36 36 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/12 11:26 AM
ORDER granting35 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .,32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Federal Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), and 12(b)(5) . Granted. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 5/26/2025 Replies due by 6/17/2025. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 5/12/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
35 35 2 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/08 5:16 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Preston J. Postlethwaite dated 05/08/2025. Document filed by Tianyi Wei..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
34 34 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/05 11:51 AM
AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Asia Pacific Ship Investment, Inc. for Bridge Investment Group, LLC. Document filed by Bridge Investment Group, LLC..(Gorman, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
33 33 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 04/29 12:28 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by American Northern Marianas Regional Center, LLC, Erik Fangshen Wang..(Geiger, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Supplement Certificate of Service
Monday, April 28, 2025
32 32 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 04/28 7:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Federal Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), and 12(b)(5) . Document filed by Bridge Investment Group, LLC, James Huang, Xianjun Meng, Silvia Siu. Responses due by 5/12/2025.(Gorman, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Xianjun Meng,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of Meng (Proof of Citizenship),
Att: 4 Affidavit of James Huang,
Att: 5 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of Huang (Proof of Citizenship),
Att: 6 Affidavit of Silvia Siu,
Att: 7 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of Siu (Proof of Citizenship),
Att: 8 Affidavit of Bridge Investment Group, LLC,
Att: 9 Supplement Certificate of Service,
Att: 10 Proposed Order Dismissing Complaint
Monday, April 21, 2025
31 31 1 pgs misc Letter Mon 04/21 8:08 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Preston J. Postlethwaite dated 04/21/2025 re: Scheduling Order Dkt. 29. Document filed by Tianyi Wei..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
30 30 2 pgs misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/15 4:10 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Asia Pacific Ship Investment, Inc. for Bridge Investment Group, LLC. Document filed by Bridge Investment Group, LLC..(Gorman, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
29 29 2 pgs order Scheduling Order Mon 04/14 2:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Based on the Courts careful review of the parties' letters, a pre-motion conference is not necessary. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, by April 21, 2025, Plaintiff shall file a letter informing the Court and Defendants whether Plaintiff intends to file an amended complaint. This will be Plaintiff's last opportunity to amend in response to any issue raised in the parties' pre-motion letters. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff elects to amend, she must file the amended complaint by April 28, 2025. Defendants shall respond to the amended complaint within 14 days of its filing. If Defendants respond with motions to dismiss, further briefing shall be submitted on the schedule set forth in Local Rule 6.1(b). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff elects not to amend, Defendants shall file their contemplated motions by April 28, 2025. Further briefing shall be submitted on the schedule set forth in Local Rule 6.1(b). Any request for an extension must be made by letter and filed on ECF at least 48 hours before the deadline. The parties are on notice that failure to comply with court orders and all applicable rules may result in sanctions, including: monetary sanctions on counsel and the parties; preclusion of claims, defenses, and evidence; and the case-terminating sanctions of dismissal for failure to prosecute and default judgment. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2025. Motions due by 4/28/2025. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/14/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
28 28 2 pgs misc Letter Fri 04/11 12:04 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Preston J. Postlethwaite dated 04/10/2025 re: Pre-Motion Response Letter. Document filed by Tianyi Wei..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
27 27 2 pgs misc Letter Mon 04/07 9:09 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Bruce Gorman dated April 7, 2025 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Bridge Investment Group, LLC, James Huang, Xianjun Meng, Silvia Siu..(Gorman, Bruce)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs misc Letter Mon 04/07 7:47 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Theodore Geiger dated 4/7/2025 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by American Northern Marianas Regional Center, LLC, Erik Fangshen Wang..(Geiger, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit 3-6-25 Wei v. Wang Order
25 25 2 pgs misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/07 2:16 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Northern Marianas Regional Center, LLC..(Geiger, Theodore)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/07 2:14 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theodore Sigmund Geiger on behalf of American Northern Marianas Regional Center, LLC, Erik Fangshen Wang..(Geiger, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
23 23 2 pgs misc Letter Wed 04/02 6:52 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Bruce Gorman, Jr., Esq. dated April 2, 2025 re: Requesting a 30 Day Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Move. Document filed by Bridge Investment Group, LLC, James Huang..(Gorman, Bruce)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/02 8:52 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Michael Gorman, Jr on behalf of Bridge Investment Group, LLC, James Huang, Xianjun Meng, Silvia Siu..(Gorman, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
21 21 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 03/19 10:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Bridge Investment Group, LLC served on 3/17/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. Service was accepted by Jing An, Esq. attorney for Bridge Investment Group, LLC. Document filed by Tianyi Wei..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 03/19 9:38 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Xianjun Meng served on 3/17/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. Service was accepted by Jing An, Esq. attorney for Xianjun Meng. Document filed by Tianyi Wei..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 03/19 9:01 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Silvia Siu served on 3/17/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. Service was accepted by Jing An, Esq. attorney for Silvia Siu. Document filed by Tianyi Wei..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 03/19 8:59 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Erik Fangshen Wang served on 3/17/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. Service was accepted by Jing An, Esq. attorney for Erik Fangshen Wang. Document filed by Tianyi Wei..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 03/19 8:55 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. American Northern Marianas Regional Center, LLC served on 3/19/2025, answer due 4/9/2025. Service was accepted by Erik Fangshen Wang on behalf of American Northern Marianas Regional Center LLC. Document filed by Tianyi Wei..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 03/19 7:25 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. James Huang served on 3/13/2025, answer due 4/3/2025. Service was accepted by Jing An., Esq Attorney for James Huang. Document filed by Tianyi Wei..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
15 15 1 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 03/12 3:03 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bridge Investment Group, LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 03/12 3:01 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Xianjun Meng. (vf)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 03/12 2:57 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Northern Marianas Regional Center, LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Wed 03/12 2:56 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Huang. (vf)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Wed 03/12 2:55 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Silvia Siu. (vf)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Wed 03/12 2:55 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Erik Fangshen Wang. (vf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
9 9 1 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 03/11 4:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRIDGE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Tianyi Wei..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 03/11 4:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AMERICAN NORTHERN MARIANAS REGIONAL CENTER LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Tianyi Wei..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 03/11 4:23 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JAMES HUANG, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Tianyi Wei..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 03/11 4:22 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SILVIA SIU, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Tianyi Wei..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 03/11 4:21 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to XIANJUN MENG, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Tianyi Wei..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 03/11 4:19 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ERIK FANGSHEN WANG, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Tianyi Wei..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
3 3 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/10 11:50 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tom M. Fini on behalf of Tianyi Wei..(Fini, Tom)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
2 2 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/07 12:52 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/07 11:05 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Preston James Postlethwaite. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 03/07 11:06 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Preston James Postlethwaite. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Bridge Investment Group, LLC, James Huang, Xianjun Meng, Silvia Siu. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 03/07 11:11 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 03/07 11:12 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 03/07 11:12 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
1 1 43 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/06 8:02 PM
COMPLAINT against American Northern Marianas Regional Center, LLC, Bridge Investment Group, LLC, James Huang, Xianjun Meng, Silvia Siu, Erik Fangshen Wang. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30726653)Document filed by Tianyi Wei..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Subscription Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - USCIS Decision Denying MRC EB-5 Program,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - PowerPoint Presentation