New York Southern District Court
Judge:Dale E Ho
Referred: Katharine H Parker
Case #: 1:25-cv-01891
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 5:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Atallah Group Us Inc.
Plaintiff
Milton Williams
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Michael A. LaBollita
Gottlieb & Associates
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Jeffrey M. Gottlieb, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 04/22 11:40 AM
ORDER RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for Tuesday, May 27, 2025 is hereby rescheduled to Friday, May 30, 2025 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York Plaintiff is directed to serve this order, and a copy of the complaint on the Defendant. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/30/2025 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/22/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 03/11 9:34 AM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: This action is scheduled for an Initial Case Management Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on Tuesday, May 27, 2025 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Initial Conference set for 5/27/2025 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/11/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 03/10 11:51 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 3/7/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs order Order Mon 03/10 11:48 AM
ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) to conduct all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. As further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 3/10/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 03/07 12:20 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Atallah Group Us Inc...(jgo)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/07 2:16 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Milton Williams..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/07 12:04 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Atallah Group Us Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Milton Williams..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 03/07 12:18 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E. Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 03/07 12:19 PM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 03/07 12:19 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 03/07 12:20 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael A. LaBollita. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/06 11:57 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/06 11:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Atallah Group Us Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30727205)Document filed by Milton Williams..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]