Oklahoma Western District Court
Case #: 5:25-cr-00074
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 8:24 AM CDT
Defendant
Kentral Ladon Castillo (1)
Represented By
Kristen Messina
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Bonnie Blumert
Federal Public Defender Office
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
David Raymond Nichols, Jr
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/22/2025 5:06 PM CDT
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
1 1 4 pgs COMPLAINT as to Kentral Ladon Castillo (1). (lb) [5:24-mj-00913-SM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet
3 3 MOTION to Seal by United States of America as to Kentral Ladon Castillo. (lb) [5:24-mj-00913-SM]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal as to Kentral Ladon Castillo (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 12/18/24. (lb) [5:24-mj-00913-SM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
Case unsealed as to Kentral Ladon Castillo (ac) [5:24-mj-00913-SM]
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed on 1/28/25 in case as to Kentral Ladon Castillo. (lb) [5:24-mj-00913-SM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kentral Ladon Castillo (ac) [5:24-mj-00913-SM]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Bonnie Blumert for Kentral Ladon Castillo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens on 1/28/2025. (ac) [5:24-mj-00913-SM]
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens:Initial Appearance as to Kentral Ladon Castillo held on 1/28/2025. Defendant remanded to custody. (ac) [5:24-mj-00913-SM]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Kentral Ladon Castillo Detention Hearing set for 2/3/2025 11:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens on 1/28/2025. (ac) [5:24-mj-00913-SM]
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs DPPA-ORDER as to Kentral Ladon Castillo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens on 1/28/2025. (ac) [5:24-mj-00913-SM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
11 11 1 pgs NOTICE OF HEARING as to Kentral Ladon Castillo Detention Hearing set for 2/3/2025 11:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens. Preliminary Hearing set for 2/3/2025 11:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens. (ac) [5:24-mj-00913-SM]
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bonnie Blumert appearing for Kentral Ladon Castillo (Blumert, Bonnie) [5:24-mj-00913-SM]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
14 14 1 pgs MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens:Preliminary Hearing as to Kentral Ladon Castillo held on 2/3/2025. Detention Hearing as to Kentral Ladon Castillo held on 2/3/2025. Defendant remanded to custody of USMS. (ac) [5:24-mj-00913-SM]
Related: [-]
15 15 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION as to Kentral Ladon Castillo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens on 2/3/2025. (ac) [5:24-mj-00913-SM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
16 16 2 pgs INDICTMENT as to Kentral Ladon Castillo (1) count(s) 1 and Criminal Forfeiture. (alw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet 1 - Kentral Ladon Castillo