Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:25-cr-00395
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 1:27 AM CST
Defendant
Roberto Trejo-Torquemada (1)
Represented By
Eva Rocio Fa'alogo
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Sarina Sophia DiPiazza
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/07/2025 3:36 AM CST
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
Arrest of Roberto Trejo-Torquemada, filed. (sr7) [7:25-mj-00300]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Roberto Trejo-Torquemada (1), filed. (Hidalgo) Initial Appearance set for 2/13/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano (kan7) (sr7). [7:25-mj-00300]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano. 8:1326 INITIAL APPEARANCE and PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION on Criminal Complaint as to Roberto Trejo-Torquemada held on 2/13/2025. (Deft informed of rights.) Defendant requests appointed counsel. Deft examined as to Financial Affidavit. Court grants. Deft, through counsel, waived Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing. Court found Probable Cause. Deft held without bond. Appearances: Lee Alfred Fry, AUSA; Juan Becerra, AFPD. (PTS: Ana Melara) (ERO: Nancy Barajas) (Interpreter: Nathan Rhodes /used) (DUSM: Tom Ayala ) Deft remanded to custody. (sg7) [7:25-mj-00300]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Eva Rocio Fa'alogo, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Roberto Trejo-Torquemada, filed. (Fa'alogo, Eva) [7:25-mj-00300]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Sarina Sophia DiPiazza appearing for USA, filed. (DiPiazza, Sarina) [7:25-mj-00300]
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Roberto Trejo-Torquemada, filed. (sr7) [7:25-mj-00300]
Related: [-]
3 3 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Roberto Trejo-Torquemada, filed. [7:25-mj-00300]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Roberto Trejo-Torquemada (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (sg7) [7:25-mj-00300]
Related: [-]
5 5 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Roberto Trejo-Torquemada. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (sg7) [7:25-mj-00300]
Related: [-]
6 6 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Roberto Trejo-Torquemada. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (sg7) [7:25-mj-00300]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Roberto Trejo-Torquemada, filed. (bao7) [7:25-mj-00300]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
8 8 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Roberto Trejo-Torquemada (1) count(s) 1, filed. (le7)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
9 9 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Roberto Trejo-Torquemada, filed. (le7)
Related: [-]