Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00346
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 12:15 AM MST
Defendant
Luz Beltran Beltran-De Gonzalez (1)
Represented By
Mark A Heath, II
Heath Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ross Gabriel Arellano Edwards
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/07/2025 2:15 AM MST
Thursday, February 06, 2025
Arrest of Luz Bertila Beltran-De Gonzalez on 2/6/2025. (KGM)[2:25-mj-09121-ESW]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Luz Bertila Beltran-De Gonzalez. (KGM)[2:25-mj-09121-ESW]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus: Initial Appearance as to Luz Bertila Beltran-De Gonzalez held on 2/10/2025. DEFENDANT SWORN AS TO FINANCIAL STATUS. The Court finds the defendant indigent and appoints CJA Attorney Mark Heath as counsel of record. The Government is seeking detention. Defendant waives a formal reading, waives the Preliminary Hearing, and submits the issue of detention to the Court. The Court finds that probable cause has been established with regard to the Criminal Complaint and further finds by a preponderance of the evidence the defendant is a flight risk. IT IS ORDERED detaining the defendant pending further proceedings. SPANISH INTERPRETER REQUIRED FOR DEFENDANT . As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Joseph Koehler for the Government, CJA Attorney Mark Heath for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Beatriz Bogard assists defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 2:46 PM to 2:54 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WMT) [2:25-mj-09121-ESW]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART
4 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus.(WMT)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:25-mj-09121-ESW]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Luz Bertila Beltran-De Gonzalez: The Court concludes that the following facts require the detention of the defendant pending further proceedings in this case. Findings of Fact and Statement of Reasons: (1) There is probable cause to believe that the defendant has committed an offense. (2) There is a serious risk that the defendant will not appear. (3) Defendant is a citizen of another country, illegally in the United States of America. (4) Defendant does not have sufficient ties to the community. (5) The reports from Pretrial Services Agency are adopted as the further findings of this Magistrate Judge. Conclusions of Law: (1) There is a serious risk that the defendant will flee. (2) No condition or combination of conditions will reasonably assure the appearance of the defendant as required. Directions Regarding Detention: The defendant is committed to the custody of the Attorney General or his/her designated representative for confinement in a corrections facility separate, to the extent practicable, from persons awaiting or serving sentences or being held in custody pending appeal. The defendant shall be afforded a reasonable opportunity for private consultation with defense counsel. On order of a court of the United States or on request of an attorney for the Government, the person in charge of the corrections facility shall deliver the defendant to the United States Marshal for the purpose of an appearance in connection with a court proceeding. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus on 2/10/25. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WMT) [2:25-mj-09121-ESW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
6 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by Luz Bertila Beltran-De Gonzalez.(Heath, Mark)[2:25-mj-09121-ESW]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 ORDER granting6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Luz Bertila Beltran-De Gonzalez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus on 2/12/2025. (CSL)[2:25-mj-09121-ESW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
8 8 INFORMATION - Felony as to Luz Bertila Beltran-De Gonzalez, Count 1. (MRH)
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Luz Beltran Beltran-De Gonzalez. (MRH)
Related: [-]
10 10 CONSENT OF DEFENDANT Luz Beltran Beltran-De Gonzalez for Guilty Plea Hearing before a United States Magistrate Judge. (MRH)
Related: [-]
11 11 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Judge Krissa M. Lanham. Filed by USA as to Luz Beltran Beltran-De Gonzalez. (MRH)
Related: [-]
12 12 MINUTE ORDER as to Luz Beltran Beltran-De Gonzalez referring this matter to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine to conduct a felony plea hearing. (MRH)
Related: [-]
13 13 IT IS ORDERED setting a change of plea hearing (30 mins) as to Luz Beltran Beltran-De Gonzalez for 3/25/2025 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine.(DMF/ah)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]