California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00646
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 06, 2025 11:22 PM PST
Defendant
Jose Pedro Resendiz (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Veronica Portillo-Heap
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Material Witness
Jose Abel Palma-Barrera
Represented By
Michael S Pedretti
Law Offices Of Michael S. Pedretti
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Hunter V. Norton
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/07/2025 1:29 AM PST
Thursday, February 06, 2025
Arrest of Jose Pedro Resendiz (no document attached) (fjp) [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Pedro Resendiz.(fjp) [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Michael S Pedretti appointed for Jose Abel Palma-Barrera. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jose Pedro Resendiz: Initial Appearance set for 2/7/2025 before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Hunter V. Norton appearing for USA. (Norton, Hunter)Attorney Hunter V. Norton added to party USA(pty:pla) (ggv). [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Initial Appearance as to Jose Pedro Resendiz held on 2/7/2025. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Jose Pedro Resendiz. Bond set as to Jose Pedro Resendiz (1) $10,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA. Bond packet due 2/14/25. Defendant to be released today. Abstract issued. Rule 5 advisement provided. The Court confirms the appointment of MW counsel Michael Pedretti(n/a).( Preliminary Hearing set for 2/20/25 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Arraignment set for 3/06/25 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. ) (CD# 2/7/2025 AHG 25-1:2:34-3:33). (Plaintiff Attorney Stephen Simpson AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Ryan De La Rosa FD-S/A). (aje) Modified on 2/9/2025 (aje). [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
5 5 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Jose Pedro Resendiz (no document attached) (aje) [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER as to Jose Pedro Resendiz: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 2/7/25. (aje) [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Jose Pedro Resendiz (1) $10,000 P/S secured by 1FRA + defendant's signature. Bond packet due by 02/14/2025 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 02/07/2025. (bas1) [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
11 11 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Jose Pedro Resendiz. (bas1) [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM Read Receipt
12 12 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jose Pedro Resendiz (bas1) [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
6 6 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jose Pedro Resendiz: Arraignment of MW Jose Abel Palma-Barrera set for 2/10/2025 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. (no document attached) (gac) [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Veronica Portillo-Heap appearing for Jose Pedro Resendiz (Portillo-Heap, Veronica)Attorney Veronica Portillo-Heap added to party Jose Pedro Resendiz(pty:dft) (jmo). [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
9 9 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Jose Pedro Resendiz (Portillo-Heap, Veronica) (jmo). [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Arraignment of Material Witness Jose Abel Palma-Barrera held on 2/10/2025. The Court confirms the appointment of MW counsel Michael Pedretti(n/a). Material Witness bail set at $5,000 PS w/50% percent cash deposit and 1 FRA. (Interpreter Paula Navarro). (CD# 2/10/2025 MSB 25-1:2:35-2:39). (Plaintiff Attorney Kaley Chan AUSA). (Defendant Attorney N/A). (no document attached) (aje) [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Jose Abel Palma-Barrera. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 P/S secured by 1FRA + 50% cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 02/10/2025. (bas1) [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
14 14 BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to Jose Pedro Resendiz. Report prepared by: J. Almaraz Hernandez. (Document applicable to Jose Pedro Resendiz, USA.) (Almaraz Hernandez, J.) [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
16 16 P/S Bond Filed as to Jose Pedro Resendiz in amount of $ 10,000, (Document applicable to USA, Jose Pedro Resendiz.) (yxc) [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
17 17 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Jose Pedro Resendiz. Preliminary Hearing set for 3/6/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 2/14/2025. (yxc) [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
18 18 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendant Jose Pedro Resendiz (TIME ONLY). Arraignment set for 3/6/2025 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Preliminary Hearing set for 3/6/2025 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (no document attached) (tkl) [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
19 19 ** DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF NO.20 ** NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Norton, Hunter) (ggv). [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
20 20 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by USA as to Jose Pedro Resendiz (Norton, Hunter) (ggv). [3:25-mj-00563-AHG]
Related: [-]
21 21 INDICTMENT as to Jose Pedro Resendiz (1) count(s) 1, 2.(axc1) (sjt).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted