Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00077
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 2:17 AM EST
Defendant
GEORGE ADAMES (3)
Defendant
ABDUL ELIZAR-NUNEZ (5)
Defendant
FRANK GARCIA-NUNEZ (4)
Defendant
JOSE AGUSTIN VERAS-REGALADO (2)
Defendant
JOSE GUILLERMO VERAS-REGALADO (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER ERIC PARISI
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Ed PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/07/2025 4:18 AM EST
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
1 1 INDICTMENT as to JOSE GUILLERMO VERAS-REGALADO (1) count(s) 1-2, 3, JOSE AGUSTIN VERAS-REGALADO (2) count(s) 3, GEORGE ADAMES (3) count(s) 3, FRANK GARCIA-NUNEZ (4) count(s) 3, ABDUL ELIZAR-NUNEZ (5) count(s) 3. (mac) (mac).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation Form
Att: 2 (3/5/2025) Indictment,
Att: 3 (3/5/2025) INFO SHEET,
Att: 4 (3/5/2025) INFO SHEET,
Att: 5 (3/5/2025) INFORMATION SHEET,
Att: 6 (3/5/2025) INFO SHEET,
Att: 7 (3/5/2025) INFO SHEET
2 2 MOTION AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF BENCH WARRANT AS TO JOSE GUILLERMO VERAS-REGALADO. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI on 3/5/25.3/5/25 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (mac)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF BENCH WARRANT AS TO JOSE AGUSTIN VERAS-REGALADO. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI on 3/5/25.3/5/25 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (mac)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF BENCH WARRANT AS TO GEORGE ADAMES. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI on 3/5/25.3/5/25 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (mac)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF BENCH WARRANT AS TO FRANK GARCIA-NUNEZ. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI on 3/5/25.3/5/25 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (mac)
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF BENCH WARRANT AS TO ABDUL ELIZAR-NUNEZ. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI on 3/5/25.3/5/25 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (mac)
Related: [-]
7 7 PETITION AND ORDER AD PROSEQUENDUM IN CASE AS TO JOSE GUILLERMO VERAS-REGALADO. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI on 3/5/25.3/5/25 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (mac)
Related: [-]
8 8 PETITION AND ORDER AD PROSEQUENDUM IN CASE AS TO FRANK GARCIA-NUNEZ. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI on 3/5/25.3/5/25 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (mac)
Related: [-]
9 9 PETITION AND ORDER AD PROSEQUENDUM IN CASE AS TO ABDUL ELIZAR-NUNEZ. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI on 3/5/25.3/5/25 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (mac)
Related: [-]