New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-08022
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2025
Terminated:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 4:09 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
ANDREW D. KOGAN
Office Of The Us Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
SHIMON Y. SOFFER (1)
Terminated: 02/14/2025
Represented By
TIMOTHY DONAHUE
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 3:14 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
Arrest (Rule 5) of SHIMON Y. SOFFER. (nic, )
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs INDICTMENT Received from MDFL as to SHIMON Y. SOFFER (8:25cr38) (nic, )
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Initial Appearance in Rule 5 Proceedings as to SHIMON Y. SOFFER held on 2/5/2025. Defendant released on $100,000 Unsecured Appearance Bond. Appearance Bond executed. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (nic, )
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ORDER advising of the United States' continuing obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 2/5/2025. (nic, )
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to SHIMON Y. SOFFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 2/5/2025. (nic, )
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to SHIMON Y. SOFFER (1) $100,000 Unsecured Appearance Bond with additional conditions (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 2/5/2025. (nic, )
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs Unsecured Appearance Bond Entered as to SHIMON Y. SOFFER in amount of $100,000. (nic, )
Related: [-]