Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Karoline Mehalchick
Case #: 3:25-cv-00426
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 5:13 AM EDT
Defendant
Riversource Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff
Kimberly Walsh
Represented By
Marc Snyder
Rosen Moss Snyder, L.L.P.
contact info
Christopher R Harris
Rosen Moss Snyder LLP
contact info
Christopher Harris
Rosen Moss Snyder LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/20 1:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riversource Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Corporate Parent Ameriprise Financial, Inc. for Riversource Life Insurance Company.. (Fogle, Douglas)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Tue 05/20 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas G Fogle on behalf of Riversource Life Insurance Company (Fogle, Douglas)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Tue 05/20 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joel M. Wertman on behalf of Riversource Life Insurance Company (Wertman, Joel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/29 2:56 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Kimberly Walsh. Riversource Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/17/2025, answer due 6/16/2025. (Snyder, Marc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
5 5 order Special Admissions Form Approved Thu 03/20 10:42 AM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Christopher R. Harris Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 3/20/2025. (cw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
4 4 misc Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/14 3:02 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Christopher R Harris on behalf of Kimberly Walsh Attorney Christopher Harris is seeking special admission Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6932063.. (Harris, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Mon 03/10 3:10 PM
ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 3/10/2025. (cw)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Mon 03/10 10:34 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Snyder is directed to have Attorney Harris file for special admission (or make arrangements to be generally admitted) and to request e-filing privileges through Pacer.uscourts.gov (all participating attorneys are required to be e-filers unless they petition the Chief Judge for exemption). (ea)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 03/07 10:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Riversource Life Insurance Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (cp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/07 10:21 AM
COMPLAINT against Riversource Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6923631), filed by Kimberly Walsh.(cp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet