Louisiana Middle District Court
Judge:Erin Wilder-Doomes
Referred: Richard L Bourgeois, Jr
Case #: 3:25-cv-00194
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Case in other court:20th Judicial District Court, 24364
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 3:38 AM CDT
Defendant
Enrico George
Defendant
Jeffrey Hall
Defendant
Andrew Hausey
Defendant
State of Louisiana
Represented By
Leonard Alexander Penzo
Louisiana Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Dustin Musso
Represented By
Donna Unkel Grodner
Grodner & Associates, Aplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
20 20 service Summons Issued Fri 05/16 7:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Enrico George, Andrew Hausey. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (CIS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
19 19 service Summons Not Previously Submitted Thu 05/15 4:24 PM
Summons Submitted as to Enrico George (Grodner, Donna)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Not Previously Submitted Thu 05/15 4:24 PM
Summons Submitted as to Andrew Hausey (Grodner, Donna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
17 17 respm Reply in Support of Motion Thu 05/01 1:26 PM
REPLY in Support of10 MOTION to Remand filed by Dustin Musso. (CIS)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 05/01 12:25 PM
ORDER granting15 MOTION for Leave of Court to File Reply in Support of Remand, filed by Plaintiff Dustin Musso. The Clerk of Court is instructed to docket the [15-2] Reply in Support of Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 05/01/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Leave to File Document Thu 05/01 8:20 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply to RD 13 Remand by Dustin Musso(Grodner, Donna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; proposed order,
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading; Reply Memorandum
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
14 14 misc Exhibits to Document Wed 04/23 4:03 PM
Exhibit(s) to13 Memorandum in Opposition to by State of Louisiana. (Penzo, Leonard)
Related: [-]
13 13 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/23 3:57 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to10 MOTION to Remand filed by State of Louisiana. (Penzo, Leonard)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
12 12 notice Notice to Counsel Mon 04/07 3:34 PM
Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending10 Motion to Remand, good cause is shown to defer entry of a scheduling order in this matter. The Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2025 is CANCELED. No status report is due at this time. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
11 11 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/04 11:58 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to9 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss no federal claim pled against the state filed by Dustin Musso. (Grodner, Donna)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Remand Fri 04/04 11:33 AM
MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs(Grodner, Donna) Modified on 4/4/2025 to edit text (CIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; proposed order,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 3 Ex 1 agent appointment,
Att: 4 Ex 2 service return
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/04 9:02 AM
12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss by State of Louisiana(Penzo, Leonard) Modified on 4/4/2025 to edit text (CIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading; Order
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
8 8 order 90 Day Conference Order Wed 03/26 1:53 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2025 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 5/8/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/26/2025. (BLR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
7 7 notice Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 03/20 6:16 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Dustin Musso identifying Corporate Parent State of Louisiana Department of Corrections, Affiliate/Interested Person Enrico George, Affiliate/Interested Person Andrew Hausey, Affiliate/Interested Person Dustin Musso, Affiliate/Interested Person Jeffrey Hall for Dustin Musso.. (Grodner, Donna)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 03/10 4:47 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings on Behalf of Defendant pursuant to Local Rule 7(a). State of Louisiana responsive pleadings due April 4, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/10/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel - Initial Designation of Consent Case Mon 03/10 10:39 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: This case has been assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals. See General Order 2024-02 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. Consent to a Magistrate Judge is voluntary. Any party may decline consent. Once all parties have appeared in this matter, a Consent Form will be noticed to the parties and a deadline set for the form to be returned to the court. The form will not be part of the court record and the identity of any party declining consent will not be communicated to any judge. (NLT)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Deficiency with LR 7.1 Fri 03/07 11:36 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to3 Certificate of Interested Persons. Failure to add all listed interested persons to CM/ECF upon filing of Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall add all interested persons listed on the certificate using the event Add Interested Person located under Notices in the CM/ECF system. (CIS)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 03/07 11:35 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by State of Louisiana. (CIS) Modified on 3/7/2025 to edit text (CIS)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Extension of Time Fri 03/07 11:19 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleadings by State of Louisiana(Penzo, Leonard) Modified on 3/7/2025 to edit text (CIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading; Order
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Complete Case Opening First) Fri 03/07 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial District Court, Case Number 24364. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAMDC-2872123), filed by State of Louisiana.(Penzo, Leonard) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/7/2025 to separate documents) (CIS). (CIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Certificate Of Interested Persons,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1-State Court Record
Att: 4 (3/7/2025) List of Documents in State Court Record,
Att: 5 (3/7/2025) Listing of All Counsel of Record,
Att: 6 (3/7/2025) Certificate of State Court Record Filing
utility Motion(s) Referred Fri 03/07 11:53 AM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:2 First MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (CIS)
Related: [-]