New York Southern District Court
Judge:Laura Taylor Swain
Case #: 1:25-cv-01902
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331ed Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Terminated:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 4:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Boys & Girls Club of the Capital Area, Inc.
Defendant
Paul Dunn
Defendant
David Gordon
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Represented By
Reyna Lubin
Eisenberg & Baum LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
6 6 order Amended Civil Case Administrative Closing Order Tue 03/18 9:07 AM
AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 5/19/2025. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/14/2021) (gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 03/18 9:03 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 03/18 9:05 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Mon 03/10 12:05 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Reyna Lubin to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; wrong Filing Court reflected on the PDF; the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 3/17/2025. (jgo) Modified on 3/10/2025 (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/10 12:08 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Reyna Lubin to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated December 4, 2024;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/10 12:10 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Reyna Lubin to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 3 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; wrong filing Court reflected on the PDF; summons request must be linked to a properly filed pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/07 11:45 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Boys & Girls Club of the Capital Area, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Lubin, Reyna)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/07 11:43 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Gordon, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Lubin, Reyna)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/07 11:42 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul Dunn, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Lubin, Reyna)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/07 11:41 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lubin, Reyna)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/07 11:40 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30729367)Document filed by Jane Doe..(Lubin, Reyna)
Related: [-]