California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: A Joel Richlin
Case #: 2:25-cv-02014
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court - Los Angeles County, 25STCV01820
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 2:02 AM PDT
Defendant
Bloomberg L.P.
Represented By
Kelsey Diane Harclerode
Zwillgen PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Clark Santoro
Represented By
Robert Tauler
Tauler Smith LLP
contact info
Wendy Robinson Miele
Tauler Smith LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/28 12:30 PM
Notice of Intent to Amend filed by Plaintiff Clark Santoro. (Tauler, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
15 15 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 04/15 11:55 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE:Defendant Bloomberg L.P.'s Notice (Other)13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Errata. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 04/15 10:34 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/12/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/14 7:25 PM
Notice of Errata filed by Defendant Bloomberg L.P.. correcting Declaration of William Anderson in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF 12) (Harclerode, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss Case Mon 04/14 5:35 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Bloomberg L.P.. Motion set for hearing on 5/19/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Harclerode, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of William Anderson,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, March 14, 2025
11 11 misc Amended Document (Non-Motion) Fri 03/14 7:02 AM
AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Bloomberg L.P.. Amendment to Corporate Disclosure Statement4 and Certification and Notice of Interested Parties (Harclerode, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/10 3:21 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Mon 03/10 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:25-cv-02014 RGK(AJRx). (rn)
Related: [-]
8 8 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 03/10 2:16 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bloomberg L.P. answer now due 4/14/2025, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Bloomberg L.P..(Harclerode, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
7 7 textonly MJDAP Timely Opt-Out Mon 03/10 2:11 PM
Declination of Consent form received on 03/10/2025 was submitted within deadline set forth in L.R. 73-2.1. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (nne)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 03/10 1:30 PM
(In Chambers) REMINDER NOTICE REGARDING DEADLINE TO OPT OUT OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (hr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
5 5 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Mon 03/10 10:52 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/07 10:12 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bloomberg L.P. (Harclerode, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Fri 03/07 10:07 AM
DECLARATION of Shane Mathieu re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Bloomberg L.P.. (Harclerode, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/07 10:05 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Bloomberg L.P.. (Harclerode, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/07 9:55 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 25SCTV01820 Receipt No: ACACDC-39250405 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Bloomberg L.P.. (Attorney Kelsey Diane Harclerode added to party Bloomberg L.P.(pty:dft))(Harclerode, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Civil Cover Sheet (L.A.),
Att: 3 Exhibit C Notice of Assignment,
Att: 4 Exhibit D ADR Package
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 03/10 10:55 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Bloomberg L.P., Does 1 through 15, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Clark Santoro. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/23/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
Related: [-]