Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Gershwin A Drain
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:25-cv-10652
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 5:02 AM EDT
Defendant
Devon Bernritter
Defendant
John Brish
Defendant
Alex Kazal
Defendant
Oakland, County of
Plaintiff
Cherry Cannady
Represented By
Megan Bonanni
Pitt, Mcgehee,
contact info


Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
16 16 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 4:21 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Alex Kazal served on 4/8/2025, answer due 4/29/2025. (Bonanni, Megan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
15 15 misc Attorney Appearance Thu 05/08 10:16 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nicole B. Tabin appearing on behalf of Oakland, County of Only (Tabin, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
14 14 notice Appearance Thu 05/01 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Layla Rose Sizemore on behalf of Alex Kazal. (Sizemore, Layla)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Appearance Thu 05/01 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor S. Potter on behalf of Alex Kazal. (Potter, Trevor)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Appearance Thu 05/01 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Clark on behalf of Alex Kazal. (Clark, Robert)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Appearance Thu 05/01 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Potter on behalf of Alex Kazal. (Potter, Steven)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Appearance Thu 05/01 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Layla Rose Sizemore on behalf of Devon Bernritter, John Brish, Oakland, County of. (Sizemore, Layla)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Appearance Thu 05/01 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor S. Potter on behalf of Devon Bernritter, John Brish, Oakland, County of. (Potter, Trevor)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Appearance Thu 05/01 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Clark on behalf of Devon Bernritter, John Brish, Oakland, County of. (Clark, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Appearance Thu 05/01 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Potter on behalf of Devon Bernritter, John Brish, Oakland, County of. (Potter, Steven)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Thu 05/01 3:04 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Oakland, County of waiver sent on 4/4/2025, answer due 6/3/2025. (Potter, Steven)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Thu 05/01 3:04 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. John Brish waiver sent on 4/4/2025, answer due 6/3/2025. (Potter, Steven)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Thu 05/01 3:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Devon Bernritter waiver sent on 4/4/2025, answer due 6/3/2025. (Potter, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
3 3 order Reassignment/Disqualification Wed 04/09 11:34 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Denise Page Hood and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand to District Judge Gershwin A. Drain and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued* Mon 03/10 1:51 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Devon Bernritter, John Brish, Alex Kazal, Oakland, County of* (SSch)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 03/07 12:20 PM
COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10147096 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 25-cv-10650, Judge Gershwin A. Drain ] (Bonanni, Megan)
Related: [-]