Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Case #: 3:25-cv-01130
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 4:58 AM AST
Defendant
1688 LLC
Defendant
Uno Mas LLC
Defendant
Restaurante Freddy Los Pinos 2 LLC
Defendant
Panucho, Inc.
Defendant
PLM Food Service, Inc.
Defendant
Ostia LLC
Defendant
O & R LLC
Defendant
Municipality of San Juan
Defendant
Mere Pescao Corp.
Defendant
Marsili LLC
Defendant
Los Pinos Restaurant 2 Inc.
Defendant
La Prea Foods L.L.C.
Defendant
La Cueva del Mar , Inc.
Defendant
Jama LLC
Defendant
Ice Cream & Limbers Island Santurce Inc.
Defendant
Foodie Forever LLC
Defendant
FMM LLC
Defendant
DKGP LLC
Defendant
Creative Food Concepts LLC
Defendant
Cana Ramen LLC
Defendant
Cafe Regina LLC
Defendant
Border Bandits LLC
Defendant
Ana's Cafe Restaurant LLC
Defendant
A Pie Cafe Bar And Restaurant Inc.
Defendant
Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Plaintiff
Andreina Hidalgo
Represented By
Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Velez Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 05/14 2:08 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until July 14, 2025 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Diana Itzel Perez-Carlo on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Responses due by 5/28/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Carlo, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 05/07 10:29 AM
Summons Issued as to 1688 LLC, Ana's Cafe Restaurant LLC, Border Bandits LLC, Cafe Regina LLC, Cana Ramen LLC, Creative Food Concepts LLC, DKGP LLC, FMM LLC, Foodie Forever LLC, Ice Cream & Limbers Island Santurce Inc., Jama LLC, La Cueva del Mar, Inc., La Prea Foods L.L.C., Los Pinos Restaurant 2 Inc., Marsili LLC, Mere Pescao Corp., O & R LLC, Ostia LLC, PLM Food Service, Inc., Panucho, Inc., Restaurante Freddy Los Pinos 2 LLC, Uno Mas LLC. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (ad)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order on Motion for Issuance of Summons Wed 05/07 10:03 AM
ORDER: Granting6 Motion for Issuance of Summons. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 05/07/2025. (MRB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
6 6 motion Issuance of Summons Tue 05/06 7:24 PM
MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to 1688 LLC, Ana's Cafe Restaurant LLC, Border Bandits LLC, Cafe Regina LLC, Cana Ramen LLC, Creative Food Concepts LLC, DKGP LLC, FMM LLC, Foodie Forever LLC, Ice Cream & Limbers Island Santurce Inc., Jama LLC, La Cueva del Mar, Inc., La Prea Foods L.L.C., Los Pinos Restaurant 2 Inc., Marsili LLC, Mere Pescao Corp., O & R LLC, Ostia LLC, PLM Food Service, Inc., Panucho, Inc., Restaurante Freddy Los Pinos 2 LLC, Uno Mas LLC filed by Jose Carlos Velez-Colon on behalf of Andreina Hidalgo. Responses due by 5/20/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Velez-Colon, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons,
Att: 9 Summons,
Att: 10 Summons,
Att: 11 Summons,
Att: 12 Summons,
Att: 13 Summons,
Att: 14 Summons,
Att: 15 Summons,
Att: 16 Summons,
Att: 17 Summons,
Att: 18 Summons,
Att: 19 Summons,
Att: 20 Summons,
Att: 21 Summons,
Att: 22 Summons
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 04/08 5:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, A Pie Cafe Bar And Restaurant Inc., Municipality of San Juan. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (ad)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order on Motion for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/08 2:34 PM
ORDER: Granting3 Motion for Issuance of Summons. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 04/08/2025. (MRB)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
3 3 motion Issuance of Summons Fri 04/04 12:00 PM
MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, A Pie Cafe Bar And Restaurant Inc., Municipality of San Juan filed by Jose Carlos Velez-Colon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 4/21/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Velez-Colon, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
Monday, March 10, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Judge Assignment Mon 03/10 8:36 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll. (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
1 1 161 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/07 11:41 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number APRDC-9016346.), filed by Andreina Hidalgo. Service due by 6/5/2025,(Velez-Colon, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Category Sheet,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet