Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-10810

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Paul Baisier
Case #: 3:25-ap-01002
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
LG Funding LLC
Represented By
LG Funding LLC
contact info
Defendant
David R. Ronig
Represented By
David R. Ronig
contact info
Plaintiff
Wardaddy Aviation, Inc.
1 Falcon Drive, Hanger B
Peachtree City, GA 30269
Represented By
Thomas T. McClendon
Jones & Walden, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
misc Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 04/21 2:58 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default, pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7055 and a Request for Entry of Default filed by Wardaddy Aviation, Inc.. It appears from the record that LG Funding LLC, has failed to plead or otherwise defend in this case as required by law. Related [+] (rso)
Related: [-] ument7
Thursday, April 10, 2025
8 8 misc 0-Certificate of Service Thu 04/10 5:57 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service of Defendant Ronig's Answer & Crossclaim Filed by Benjamin S. Klehr on behalf of David R. Ronig. Related [+] (Klehr, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 6
7 7 misc Request for Entry of Default Thu 04/10 3:00 PM
Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant LG Funding LLC Filed by Thomas T. McClendon on behalf of Wardaddy Aviation, Inc.. (McClendon, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
6 6 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Crossclaim Mon 04/07 2:27 PM
Answer to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses And Crossclaim by David R. Ronig against LG Funding LLC filed by Benjamin S. Klehr on behalf of David R. Ronig. Related [+] (Klehr, Benjamin)Modified on 4/8/2025 (kdh)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, March 10, 2025
5 5 notice Acknowledgement of Service Mon 03/10 4:31 PM
Acknowledgement of Service of David R. Ronig Filed by Thomas T. McClendon on behalf of Wardaddy Aviation, Inc.. Related [+] (McClendon, Thomas)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
4 4 misc 0-Certificate of Service Mon 03/10 12:17 PM
Certificate of Service of Complaint and Summons Filed by Thomas T. McClendon on behalf of Wardaddy Aviation, Inc.. Related [+] (McClendon, Thomas)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Friday, March 07, 2025
3 3 court Summons/Alias Summons Issued (auto) Fri 03/07 5:54 PM
Summons Issued on LG Funding LLC Answer Due 04/7/2025; David R. Ronig Answer Due 04/7/2025 (kmw)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons/Alias Summons Issued (auto) Fri 03/07 5:53 PM
[DOCKETED IN ERROR] Summons Issued on LG Funding LLC Answer Due 04/7/2025; David R. Ronig Answer Due 04/7/2025 (kmw)Modified on 3/7/2025 (kmw)
Related: [-]
court Notice of Incorrect Docket Entry Fri 03/07 5:59 PM
Notice that Document Number 2 - Summons Issued, was entered in error. Related [+] (kmw)
Related: [-] 2
Thursday, March 06, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/06 3:24 PM
Adversary case 25-01002 Complaint against LG Funding LLC, David R. Ronig , 91 (Declaratory judgment) 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)) 12 Related [+] Filed by Wardaddy Aviation, Inc. (McClendon, Thomas)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference