California Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean C Riordan
Case #: 2:25-cv-00763
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 2:25 AM PDT
Defendant
Land Geek Enterprises, LLC
Plaintiff
David Stockton
Represented By
Gerald D. Lane, Jr.
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 05/05 4:12 PM
WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Land Geek Enterprises, LLC on 5/2/2025, Answer due 7/1/2025 (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Fri 03/07 7:55 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Deputy Clerk VLK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Fri 03/07 7:55 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Land Geek Enterprises, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gerald D. Lane, Jr.* *The Law Offices of Jibrael S. Hindi, PLLC* *1515 NE 26th St* *Wilton Manors, FL 33305*. (Deputy Clerk VLK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
1 1 10 pgs COMPLAINT against Land Geek Enterprises, LLC by David Stockton. Attorney Lane, Gerald D. added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-12082065)(Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet