Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Virginia M Hernandez Cov
Referred: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Case #: 8:25-cv-00554
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 4:56 AM EDT
Defendant
Does 1-10
Defendant
Joby Aero, Inc.
Defendant
Joby Aviation, Inc.
Plaintiff
Aerosonic LLC
Represented By
Calvin P. Griffth
Jones Day
contact info
Troy A. Fuhrman
Hill Ward Henderson, PA
contact info
Allison M Stevenson
Hill Ward Henderson
contact info
Zachary J. Hardy
Jones Day
contact info
Randall E. Kay
contact info


Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
28 28 motion Dismiss Mon 05/19 7:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Joby Aero, Inc., Joby Aviation, Inc..(Thanasides, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
27 27 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/19 7:20 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Joby Aero, Inc.. (Thanasides, Paul)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/19 7:20 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Joby Aviation, Inc.. (Thanasides, Paul)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Request for Oral Argument Mon 05/19 6:05 PM
REQUEST for oral argument by Joby Aero, Inc., Joby Aviation, Inc.. (Thanasides, Paul)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice to take judicial notice Mon 05/19 5:57 PM
NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice regarding by Joby Aero, Inc., Joby Aviation, Inc..(Thanasides, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit O
Friday, May 16, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of appearance Fri 05/16 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary Elise Thornton on behalf of Joby Aero, Inc., Joby Aviation, Inc. (Thornton, Hillary)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of appearance Fri 05/16 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B. Thanasides on behalf of Joby Aero, Inc., Joby Aviation, Inc. (Thanasides, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
21 21 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/23 10:32 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Zachary J. Hardy may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel submit their Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration (see https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers) within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 4/23/2025. (CES)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/23 10:31 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Calvin P. Griffith may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel submit their Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration (see https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers) within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 4/23/2025. (CES)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/23 10:30 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Randall E. Kay may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel submit their Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration (see https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers) within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 4/23/2025. (CES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 4:30 PM
MOTION for Zachary J. Hardy to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-23276270 for $150 by Aerosonic LLC. (Fuhrman, Troy)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 4:27 PM
MOTION for Calvin P. Griffith to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-23276245 for $150 by Aerosonic LLC. (Fuhrman, Troy)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 4:25 PM
MOTION for Randall E. Kay to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-23276204 for $150 by Aerosonic LLC. (Fuhrman, Troy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
15 15 order Order Tue 03/25 11:30 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by May 27, 2025, file a completed uniform Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/25/2025. (DMD)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs service Waiver of service executed Tue 03/25 9:56 AM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 3/21/25 by Aerosonic LLC as to Joby Aero, Inc. (Fuhrman, Troy) Modified docket text on 3/25/2025 (EVK)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs service Waiver of service executed Tue 03/25 9:55 AM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 3/21/25 by Aerosonic LLC as to Joby Aviation, Inc. (Fuhrman, Troy) Modified docket text on 3/25/2025 (EVK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
12 12 3 pgs notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 03/13 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Troy A. Fuhrman on behalf of Aerosonic LLC. Lead Counsel: Troy A. Fuhrman. (Fuhrman, Troy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
11 11 3 pgs notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 03/11 9:56 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Aerosonic LLC. Related case(s): No (Fuhrman, Troy)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 03/10 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), which requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 03/10 9:57 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order Mon 03/10 9:56 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: The Court is aware of the notice entered in this case, explaining that Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the filing of a uniform case management report with forty or seventy days, depending on the circumstances of the case. However, under Local Rule 1.01(b), a judge can modify or suspend for all or part of an action the application of any rule, except Rule 1.05(a). This Court finds it beneficial to enter a fast-track scheduling order in certain categories of cases before entry of a case management and scheduling order. Additionally, in cases that are not fast-tracked, this Court finds it efficient to have the parties confer and file case management reports within 14 days after the defendant's responsive pleading is due or within 14 days after a case is removed to this Court. In light of this, the Court hereby suspends Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) in this case. At a time the Court deems appropriate, the Court will enter a further order in this case setting either a deadline to file a completed uniform case management report or various fast-track deadlines for the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/10/2025. (MEJ)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 03/10 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 03/10 9:44 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Calvin P. Griffth, Randall E. Kay, Zachary J. Hardy Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the lawyer seeking Special Admission or the motion may be filed in paper format; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 03/10 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons issued Mon 03/10 9:41 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Joby Aero, Inc., Joby Aviation, Inc. (BD)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 03/07 2:29 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:25-cv-554-VHC-AAS. (ARL)
Related: [-]
2 2 5 pgs misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Fri 03/07 12:23 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Aerosonic LLC. (Fuhrman, Troy)
Related: [-]
1 1 37 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/07 12:14 PM
COMPLAINT Injunctive Relief Sought, and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23102603) filed by Aerosonic LLC.(Fuhrman, Troy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit Exhibit 1 to the Complaint,
Att: 3 2 pgs Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 2 pgs Proposed Summons