Silvan v. The White Stone Group, LLC
Tennessee Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine A Crytzer |
Referred: | Jill E Mccook |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-00097 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 5:15 AM EDT |
Defendant
The White Stone Group, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Silvan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Certificate of Corporate Interest by The White Stone Group, LLC. (Pinn, Jerome) |
|
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Thu 05/08 8:15 AM
ORDER. The Court ORDERS the Parties to confer and submit the required Rule 26(f) report on or before May 21, 2025. For the convenience of the Parties, the Court's Judicial Preferences and a Sample Civil Scheduling Order are available at https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/katherine-crytzer-united-states-district-judge. The Court will determine whether to hold a Rule 16 scheduling conference after receiving the Parties' Rule 26(f) report. Signed by District Judge Katherine A. Crytzer on 05/08/2025. This docket entry constitutes the complete order of the Court. (MJN) |
|
Wednesday, May 07, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 5/7/25. (ABF) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint by The White Stone Group, LLC.(Pinn, Jerome) |
|
Thursday, April 10, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rachel Silvan. The White Stone Group, LLC waiver sent on 3/7/2025. (Friauf, James) |
|
Friday, March 07, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 3/7/25. (ABF) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 3/7/25. (ABF) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 3/7/25. (ABF) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against The White Stone Group, LLC d/b/a Vyne Medical ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5929810.), filed by Rachel Silvan.(Friauf, James) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 03/07 12:59 PM
District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (ABF) |
||
service
Summons NOT Issued
Fri 03/07 1:00 PM
No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to The White Stone Group, LLC.. (ABF) |