California Northern District Court
Judge:Alex G Tse
Case #: 3:25-cv-02363
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Terminated:Apr 07, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, 25CV110870
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 1:46 AM PDT
Defendant
Houston Casualty Company
Represented By
Gary Robert Selvin
Selvin Wraith LLP
contact info
Robin Danean Korte
Selvin Wraith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Douglas Marshall
Represented By
Na'il Benjamin
Benjamin Law Group, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 04/04 4:09 PM
ORDER on Motions to Dismiss by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting (10) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:25-cv-02363-AGT; granting (7) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:25-cv-02447-AGT; granting (7) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:25-cv-02451-AGT. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
17 17 oth_sup Statement of Non-Opposition Wed 04/02 11:00 AM
Statement of Non-Opposition re10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byHouston Casualty Company. Related [+] (Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, March 28, 2025
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 03/28 11:29 AM
Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
16 16 oth_sup Re-notice motion Tue 03/25 1:31 PM
Renotice motion hearing RE Related Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byHouston Casualty Company. (Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Tue 03/25 9:34 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: regarding 9 Administrative Motion. The Court finds that case number 25-cv-2447-KAW (H. Marshall Properties LLC v. Houston Casualty Company) and case number 25-cv-2451-SK (H.A. Marshall Investments, Inc. dba Autotrends v. Houston Casualty Company) are related to case number 25-cv-2363-AGT (Marshall v. Houston Casualty Company. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2025)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
14 14 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 03/19 4:26 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Houston Casualty Company.. (Korte, Robin)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 03/19 2:08 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Douglas Marshall.. (Benjamin, Na'il)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 03/14 3:12 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/21/2025. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Fri 03/14 1:00 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byHouston Casualty Company. Related [+] (Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-] 10
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
10 10 motion Dismiss Fri 03/14 12:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Houston Casualty Company. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/2/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. Responses due by 3/28/2025. Replies due by 4/4/2025.(Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
9 9 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Fri 03/14 11:09 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Houston Casualty Company. Responses due by 3/18/2025.(Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
8 8 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 03/11 8:50 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Houston Casualty Company (Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
7 7 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 03/07 2:08 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 03/07 12:04 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/21/2025. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/07 11:57 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by Houston Casualty Company . (Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/07 11:32 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by Houston Casualty Company . (Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 03/07 10:57 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Houston Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Houston Casualty Company. (Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 03/07 10:54 AM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Houston Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Houston Casualty Company. (Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 03/07 10:47 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is 25CV110870. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20429475). Filed by Houston Casualty Company.(Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 03/07 10:56 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Updated CAND Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Please refer to our court website for all updated documentation. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Houston Casualty Company (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 03/07 11:34 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Updated CAND Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Please refer to our court website for all updated documentation. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. Re:4 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Houston Casualty Company (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]