Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Jessica D Hedges
Case #: 1:25-cv-10561
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
5 5 misc Copy Mailed Tue 05/06 12:13 PM
Copy mailed Order4 and IFP Form Roland Yarpah Suffolk County Sheriff's Department 20 Bradston Street Boston, MA 02118 (on 5-6-25) (FC)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/05 4:55 PM
Magistrate Judge Jessica D. Hedges: PROCEDURAL ORDER entered denying without prejudice2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If Mr. Yarpah wishes to proceed with this action, within 21 days of the date of this Procedural Order, he either must (1) pay the $405.00 filing fee; or (2) file a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. If he is in custody, the motion must be accompanied by a certified copy of his prison account statement. Failure to comply with this directive may result in the reassignment of the case to a District Judge for further review. (bm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Mon 03/10 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jessica D. Hedges assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are required to submit a form indicating whether the parties consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. The parties are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (SEC)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 03/07 4:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roland Yarpah.(FC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/07 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Lynn District Court, filed by Roland Yarpah.(FC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit