Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Referred: Laura Lothman Lambert
Case #: 3:25-cv-00257
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause05:0704 Labor Litigation
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 4:56 AM EDT
Defendant
CSX Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff
Donald Lee Moss
Represented By
Richard Errol Johnson
Law Office Of Richard E. Johnson
contact info
Lisa Catherine Lambert
Law Office Of Lisa C. Lambert
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/08 5:45 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting doc. 9 Unopposed Motion for Special Admission. Joseph C. Devine, Esq., is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant. Counsel Devine shall register with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system if he has not done so already. In light of the foregoing, docs. 11 , 12 Unopposed Motions for Special Admission are denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 5/8/2025. (BJR)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 05/08 10:59 AM
SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL Lisa Catherine Lambert and Richard Errol Johnson of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of appearance Wed 05/07 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Gabriel Woodlee on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Woodlee, John)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 05/07 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael E. Lockamy on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. Lead Counsel: Joseph C. Devine. (Lockamy, Michael) Modified text on 5/8/2025 (GL)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Wed 05/07 1:41 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by CSX Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transportation, Inc. (Lockamy, Michael) Modified on 5/8/2025 (JG)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/07 1:36 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Lockamy, Michael) Modified text on 5/8/2025 (GL)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/07 11:04 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Joseph C. Devine to appear pro hac vice by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Devine, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. Modified text on 5/7/2025 (GL)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/07 10:56 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Joseph C. Devine to appear pro hac vice by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Devine, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. Modified text on 5/7/2025 (GL)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 05/07 9:13 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Joseph C. Devine Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - Pay the Special Admission Fee (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MDC)
Related: [-]
misc Pay Fee Wed 05/07 10:30 AM
FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-23332399 for $150 paid. Special Admission fee for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph C. Devine. (Devine, Joseph) Modified text on 5/7/2025 (GL)
Related: [-]
misc Pay Fee Wed 05/07 1:33 PM
FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-23332399 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph C. Devine. (Devine, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/06 2:11 PM
MOTION for Joseph C. Devine to appear pro hac vice by CSX Transportation, Inc. (e-portal) (JDR)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 03/17 3:35 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Donald Lee Moss. (Johnson, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 03/13 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order Thu 03/13 1:45 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective April 1, 2024, and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/13/2025. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
5 5 service Waiver of service executed Tue 03/11 9:58 AM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 3/11/2025 by CSX Transportation, Inc. as to CSX Transportation, Inc. (Devine, Joseph) Modified text on 3/11/2025 (JK)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/10 4:59 PM
NOTICE by Donald Lee Moss of designation of lead counsel (Johnson, Richard)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 03/10 3:10 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Lisa Catherine Lambert and Richard Errol Johnson of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JVC)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/10 10:28 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:25-cv-257-WWB-LLL. (RLK)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/07 4:55 PM
COMPLAINT against CSX Transportation, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23105248) filed by Donald Lee Moss.(Johnson, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet