Consolidated
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:25-cv-00241
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Case in other court:Indiana Northern, 4:25-cv-00012
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
GREENSTONE LLC
Defendant
PFIZER INC
Defendant
PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC
Defendant
PRASCO LABORATORIES
Defendant
VIATRIS INC
Interested Party
JACOB WOODY
Plaintiff
PATRICK MARTIN
Represented By
WILLIAM KENT WININGHAM
Wilson Kehoe & Winingham - Indianapolis In
contact info
Plaintiff
THERESA MARTIN
Represented By
WILLIAM KENT WININGHAM
Wilson Kehoe & Winingham - Indianapolis In
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, March 17, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/17 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM KENT WININGHAM on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WININGHAM, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
11 11 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 4:25-cv-00012. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
10 10 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring case to Multi-District Litigation MDL-3140 in the Northern District of Florida before Judge M. Casey Rodgers. Signed by James V Ingold Clerk of the Panel on 3/7/25. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/7/2025.]
Related: [-]
9 9 Uncertified CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) transferring case to MDL 3140 in the Northern District of Florida before Judge M. Casey Rodgers. Signed by James V Ingold, Clerk of the Panel on 3/7/2025. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/7/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
8 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Martin, Patrick Martin. Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC served on 2/24/2025, answer due 3/17/2025.(Winingham, William) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/7/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Documentation
7 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Martin, Patrick Martin. Pfizer Inc served on 2/24/2025, answer due 3/17/2025.(Winingham, William) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/7/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Documentation
Thursday, February 20, 2025
6 6 Summons Issued as to Greenstone LLC, Pfizer Inc, Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Prasco Laboratories, Viatris Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ash) (ash). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/7/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/20/2025) Corrected Main Document
Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. **NEW CASE** (ash) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/7/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance by D Bruce Kehoe on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kehoe, D) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/7/2025.]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily K Chimenti on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Chimenti, Emily) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/7/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 STATEMENT Plaintiffs' Disclosure . (Winingham, William) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/7/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William K Winingham on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Winingham, William) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/7/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5819917.), filed by Theresa Martin, Patrick Martin.(Winingham, William) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/7/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons