Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Ross
Case #: 4:25-cv-00287
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Case in other court:Circuit Court of St. Louis City, 2522-CC00074
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 4:02 AM CDT
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
1 State Famr Plaza B3
Bloomington, IL 61710
Represented By
Evan M. Porter
Brinker And Doyen LLP
contact info
Jennifer L. Howell
Brinker And Doyen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Annette Shaw-Neighbors
Represented By
Ryan R. Cox
Ryan R Cox And Associates LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
11 11 order Case Management Order Thu 04/10 2:05 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Motion to Join Parties due by 9/15/2025. Discovery Completion due by 2/27/2026. ADR Future Reference 9/15/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2026. Jury Trial set for 8/24/2026 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before Sr. District Judge John A. Ross. Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2026 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before Sr. District Judge John A. Ross). Signed by Sr. District Judge John A. Ross on 4/10/2025. (LNJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
10 10 misc Joint Scheduling Plan Wed 04/09 2:41 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Annette Shaw-Neighbors. . (Cox, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Mon 03/10 4:44 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Annette Shaw-Neighbors. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Cox, Ryan)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Rule 16 Order Mon 03/10 2:17 PM
ORDER REQUIRING JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING PLAN: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all counsel in this matter shall be familiar with the Court's Local Rules and shall read the Administrative Procedures for Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) and the undersigned's Requirements and Federal Practice Tips at www.moed.uscourts.gov. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 4/11/2025.) Signed by Sr. District Judge John A. Ross on 3/10/25. (JAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
7 7 cmp Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY Fri 03/07 3:24 PM
Petition Related [+] Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Annette Shaw-Neighbors.(JBH)
Related: [-] moval/Transfer
6 6 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 03/07 2:11 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Evan M. Porter for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Porter, Evan)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/07 2:10 PM
Defendants ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Howell, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Plaintiff Petition
4 4 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 03/07 2:08 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer L. Howell for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Howell, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Fri 03/07 2:08 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Howell, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 03/07 2:07 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Howell, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Petition Fri 03/07 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis City, case number 2522-CC00074, with receipt number AMOEDC-11128797, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Howell, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Petition FS 01.10.25,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Summons issued to State Farm,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - 02.04.25 Notice of Lawsuit,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Return of Service,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form,
Att: 7 Attachment State Court Pleadings
misc Case Opening Notification Fri 03/07 3:31 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JBH)
Related: [-]