Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Scott L Palk
Referred: Suzanne Mitchell
Case #: 5:25-cv-00296
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
13 13 misc Mail Returned Tue 05/06 11:14 AM
Mail Returned as Refused re12 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, as to Edward R Brown, Sr (alw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Envelope Contents
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/22 1:59 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $2.00 by 5/13/25. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments until he has paid the full $350.00 filing fee. The Clerk of Court shall not issue process until further order of the Court, and the Clerk shall send a copy of this order to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 4/22/25. (lb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
11 11 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/10 4:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edward R Brown, Sr. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell.(alw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Offender Statement Report,
Att: 2 Envelope
10 10 misc Mail Returned Thu 04/10 4:34 PM
Mail Returned as REFUSED re4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,1 Complaint,3 Order Reassigning Case. (alw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Envelope Contents
9 9 misc Mail Returned Thu 04/10 4:31 PM
Mail Returned as REFUSED re7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (alw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Envelope Contents
Monday, March 24, 2025
8 8 misc Mail Returned Tue 03/25 8:37 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Complaint as to Edward R Brown, Sr. (alw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Envelope Contents
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/24 3:25 PM
SECOND ORDER to Cure Deficiencies by 4/14/25 regarding6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 3/24/25. (lb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/17 11:26 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edward R Brown, Sr. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell.(alw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, March 10, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/10 2:09 PM
ORDER to Cure Deficiencies by 3/31/25. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 3/10/25. (lb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 03/07 2:08 PM
ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell.. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 03/07/2025. (alw)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 03/07 1:46 PM
ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Scott L. Palk for all further proceedings. Judge Charles Goodwin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 03/07/2025. (alw)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Previous Cases Fri 03/07 12:49 PM
PREVIOUS Cases (alw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/07 12:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Oklahoma State of, Fred C Smith filed by Edward R Brown, Sr.(alw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope