Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Joe Heaton
Referred: Chris M Stephens
Case #: 5:25-cv-00300
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
8 8 misc Receipt Fri 04/11 12:20 PM
Receipt for Money Received from Kent G Savage in the amount of $3.00, receipt number 500011495 regarding1 Complaint, (alw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/25 11:00 AM
ORDER to Cure. Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the remaining $3.00 not later than April 15, 2025. The Clerk of Court will not issue summons before the completion of screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens on 3/25/2025. (ac)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
6 6 notice ~Notice (other) Fri 03/21 12:44 PM
NOTICE (other) titled, "Status of Summons" by Kent G Savage(rp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, March 07, 2025
5 5 misc Receipt Fri 03/07 3:15 PM
Receipt for Money Received from Kent G Savage in the amount of $402.00, receipt number 500011014 regarding1 Complaint, (alw)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 03/07 2:54 PM
ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens. Entered at the direction of Judge Joe Heaton on 3/7/25. (rp)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Previous Cases Fri 03/07 2:51 PM
PREVIOUS Cases (rp)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/07 2:47 PM
PRO SE LITIGANT'S REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF 4 SUMMONS(ES) by Kent G Savage.(rp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/07 2:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Steve Harpe, Mark Knutson, David Rogers, Steve Ruby filed by Kent G Savage.(rp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Facility Operations,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Hymns,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Request to Staff,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Articles of Faith,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Cover letter,
Att: 6 Envelope