Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:25-cv-00270
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Terminated:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 4:08 AM CDT
Defendant
Platinum Programming and Diagnostics, LLC
Represented By
Chase Fann
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Bethany M. Vanhooser
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Samuel L. Jackson
Bone, Mcallester & Norton, Pllc (nashville Office)
contact info
Plaintiff
Noah Hawkins
Represented By
Kerry E. Knox
Castelli & Knox, LLP
contact info
Stephen W. Grace
Dlaw
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 05/01 9:35 AM
***Civil Case Terminated per Notice13 and chambers. No order to enter. (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/29 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Noah Hawkins (Grace, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 04/10 2:20 PM
ORDER granting11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. Platinum Programming and Diagnostics, LLC answer due 5/23/2025. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/10/2025. (ch)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/10 10:25 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleading by Platinum Programming and Diagnostics, LLC. (Fann, Chase)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 04/07 10:35 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Chase Fann, Bethany M. Vanhooser, Samuel L. Jackson admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 05, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 04/05 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel L. Jackson on behalf of Platinum Programming and Diagnostics, LLC (Jackson, Samuel)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 04/05 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany M. Vanhooser on behalf of Platinum Programming and Diagnostics, LLC (Vanhooser, Bethany)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 04/05 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chase Fann on behalf of Platinum Programming and Diagnostics, LLC (Fann, Chase)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/17 10:51 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Noah Hawkins. Platinum Programming and Diagnostics, LLC served on 3/11/2025. (Grace, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Fri 03/07 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2025 at 03:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (sb)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 03/07 1:57 PM
Summons issued as to Platinum Programming and Diagnostics, LLC. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (sb)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Fri 03/07 1:56 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (sb)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Fri 03/07 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (sb)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Fri 03/07 1:55 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (sb)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/07 1:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Platinum Programming and Diagnostics, LLC (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4275197), filed by Noah Hawkins.(sb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent of Noah Hawkins,
Att: 2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 03/07 2:03 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Kerry E. Knox, Stephen W. Grace admitted to this court . (sb)
Related: [-]