Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:25-cv-00415
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Terminated:Apr 10, 2025
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, 24-00002-23488-8-SEA
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 2:11 AM PDT
Defendant
Bio Bidet Innovation LLC
Represented By
Jenna M Poligo
Stoel Rives Llp (wa)
contact info
Maren Roxanne Norton
Stoel Rives Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By
Elizabeth G Smith
Law Office Of Elizabeth G Smith
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
13 13 order 1 - Order ~Util - Terminate Case Thu 04/10 2:47 PM
ORDER granting Parties'12 Stipulation. The claims brought in the above-captioned matter are dismissed with prejudice and without costs. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Stipulation Thu 04/10 11:41 AM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice by parties (Smith, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
11 11 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 03/17 2:01 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide General Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Smith, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/14 3:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint; Second Amended Complaint by Bio Bidet Innovation LLC.(Poligo, Jenna)
Related: [-]
9 9 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 03/14 3:10 PM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Bemis Manufacturing Company for Bio Bidet Innovation LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Bio Bidet Innovation LLC. (Poligo, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
8 8 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Thu 03/13 9:37 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/3/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/17/2025, Joint Status Report due by 4/24/2025. (DS)
Related: [-]
7 7 order KKE Order Re Chambers Procedures CV (FORM) Thu 03/13 9:35 AM
ORDER REGARDING CHAMBERS PROCEDURES IN CIVIL CASES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
6 6 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Thu 03/13 9:34 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
5 5 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Wed 03/12 10:52 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (AVC)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Wed 03/12 10:41 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Notice of Removal. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s). See attached letter for more information and instructions. (AVC)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 03/12 9:59 AM
District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson added. (AVC)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Wed 03/12 10:37 AM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Nationwide General Insurance Company, Bemis Manufacturing Company, and Bio Bidet Innovation LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/19/2025. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(AVC) Modified on 3/12/2025 to strike Bemis party as they were terminated in state court prior to removal. (CDA)
Related: [-]
utility Notice of Docket Text Modification Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/12 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines. Entry corrected to strike Bemis Manufacturing Company as the party was terminated in state court prior to removal. (CDA)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
3 3 misc Declaration (non motion) Fri 03/07 2:30 PM
DECLARATION of David Howell re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant BioBidet Innovation, LLC (Poligo, Jenna)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration (non motion) Fri 03/07 2:29 PM
DECLARATION of Jenna M. Poligo re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant BioBidet Innovation, LLC (Poligo, Jenna)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 03/07 2:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior, case number 24 2-23488 8-SEA; Related [+] filed by BioBidet Innovation, LLC.(Poligo, Jenna)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8873019
Att: 1 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet