Oklahoma Northern District Court
Case #: 4:25-cr-00070
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 1:23 AM CST
Defendant
Felipe De Jesus Mendoza-Lopez (1)
Represented By
Carla ReNae Stinnett
Stinnett Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Adam Bailey
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/08/2025 3:12 AM CST
Thursday, February 27, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT approved by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele by USA as to Felipe Jesus Mendoza-Lopez (1) (cjb, Dpty Clk) [4:25-mj-00149-MTS]
Related: [-]
2 2 WARRANT Issued by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele as to Felipe Jesus Mendoza-Lopez (cjb, Dpty Clk) [4:25-mj-00149-MTS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
3 3 DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET(S) by USA as to Felipe Jesus Mendoza-Lopez (alg, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
4 4 INDICTMENT by USA as to Felipe Jesus Mendoza-Lopez (1) count(s) 1 (alg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 3/7/2025 Defendants name corrected by interlineation per10 to reflect the name of Felipe De Jesus Mendoza-Lopez (tjc, Dpty Clk).
Related: [-]
5 5 SEALED UNREDACTED VERSION of Dkt #4 per FRCrP 49.1(f) (alg, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]