Nebraska District Court
Case #: 4:25-cr-03026
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 1:14 AM CST
Defendant
Michelle Simmons (1)
Represented By
Renee L. Mathias
Shapiro, Riha Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Daniel D. Packard
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Lincoln
contact info

GPO Apr 16 2025
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Defendant's motion to continue, (Filing No. 14), is granted. Pretrial motions and briefs shall be filed on or before May 16, 2025. The conference call previously scheduled to be held on April 22, 2025, is continued. A telephonic conference with counsel will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge at 10:15 a.m. on May 19, 2025 to discuss setting any pretrial motion hearing needed, a change of plea hearing, or the date of the jury trial and deadlines for disclosing experts as required under Rule 16. The time between today's date and May 19, 2025 shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirements of the Speedy Trial Act as to Michelle Simmons. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (TCL)

Docket last updated: 03/08/2025 2:56 AM CST
Thursday, March 06, 2025
1 1 INFORMATION as to defendant Michelle Simmons. (TCL)
Related: [-]
2 2 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET as to defendant Michelle Simmons. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (TCL)
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Michelle Simmons regarding Information - Misdemeanor1 . ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. Initial Appearance set for 3/19/2025 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (TCL)
Related: [-]