Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-08538
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Terminated:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 1:05 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Israel Denis Coc-Juc (1)
Terminated: 02/18/2025
Represented By
Gregory Solares
Law Office Of Gregory Solares PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/08/2025 3:18 AM MST
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
Arrest of Israel Denis Coc-Juc on 2/5/2025. (JAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Israel Denis Coc-Juc. (JAM)
Related: [-]