California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:25-bk-10597
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Corto II, LLC
PO Box 4858
Laguna Beach, CA 92652-4858
Represented By
James Mortensen
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
45 45 notice Notice of Bar Date For Filing Proofs of Claim (Ch 11) Thu 05/15 9:45 AM
Notice of Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claim in a Chapter 11 Filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC. (Mortensen, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
44 44 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Tue 05/13 7:24 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Gardner, Kit. (Gardner, Kit)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
43 43 court Case Reassigned - Admin Order Reassigning Judge Only (batch) Mon 05/12 9:14 AM
In accordance with the Administrative Order 25-05 dated 5/5/2025, this case is hereby reassigned from Judge Theodor Albert to Judge Scott C Clarkson. (JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
42 42 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) Tue 05/06 5:30 PM
Hearing Continued Status Conference Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/18/2025 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Deadline to file plan and disclosure statement: September 1, 2025; Last pretrial motion: September 24, 2025; Claims Bar Date: July 31, 2025; Deadline to Serve Notice of Bar Date: June 1, 2025; Continued Status Conference Date: November 18, 2025 at 11:00 a.m.; Deadline to file Updated Report: November 4, 2025 (waived if plan and disclosure statement are timely filed). (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC
Monday, May 05, 2025
41 41 misc Voluntary Dismissal of Motion Mon 05/05 12:02 PM
Voluntary Dismissal of Motion ; along with Proof of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA) Related [+]. (Ng, Queenie)
Related: [-] 23 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 1112(b); Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Alfred Cooper III in Support Thereof; along with Notice of Motion and Proof of Service
Friday, May 02, 2025
40 40 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 05/02 8:30 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC. (Mortensen, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Holographic SIgnatures
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
39 39 answer Reply Tue 04/29 2:47 PM
Reply to Related [+] Reply to Debtor's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Convert under Chapter 7; along with Proof of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA) (Ng, Queenie)
Related: [-] 23 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 1112(b); Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Alfred Cooper III in Support Thereof; along with Notice of Motion and Proof of Service filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA)
38 38 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Tue 04/29 12:54 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 5/6/2025 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued to 5-06-25 at 11:00 A.M. Per Notice Of Continued Hearing On Motion By USTR To Dismiss Or Convert Case Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b) - See Doc #35 (GD)
Related: [-] 23 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA)
Saturday, April 26, 2025
37 37 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Sat 04/26 1:28 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC. (Mortensen, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
36 36 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) Wed 04/23 11:53 AM
Hearing Continued Status Conference Re: Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual LLC Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 5/6/2025 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued to May 6, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC
35 35 notice Notice Tue 04/22 3:11 PM
Notice of Continued Hearing; along with Proof of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA) Related [+]. (Ng, Queenie)
Related: [-] 23 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 1112(b); Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Alfred Cooper III in Support Thereof; along with Notice of Motion and Proof of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA).
34 34 answer Opposition Tue 04/22 10:03 AM
Opposition to Related [+] Filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC (Mortensen, James)
Related: [-] 23 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 1112(b); Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Alfred Cooper III in Support Thereof; along with Notice of Motion and Proof of Service filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA), 24 Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Monday, April 21, 2025
33 33 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 04/21 2:29 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT PDF IMMEDIATELY. YOU HAVE LINK THIS DOCUMENT TO THE WRONG DOCUMENT - PLEASE CORRECT ASAP Related [+] (GD)
Related: [-] 32 Opposition filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC
32 32 answer Opposition Mon 04/21 1:20 PM
Opposition to Related [+] Filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC (Mortensen, James)
Related: [-] 24 Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option),30 Opposition filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC, 31 Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
31 31 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Tue 04/15 10:03 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - Document filed with interactive fields. Attorney instructed to refile the document flattened -The Proof Of Service Needs To Be Flattened Related [+] (GD)
Related: [-] 30 Opposition filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC
Monday, April 14, 2025
30 30 answer Opposition Mon 04/14 7:33 PM
Opposition to Related [+] Filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC (Mortensen, James)
Related: [-] 23 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 1112(b); Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Alfred Cooper III in Support Thereof; along with Notice of Motion and Proof of Service filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA)
Sunday, April 13, 2025
29 29 misc Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference Sun 04/13 11:10 PM
Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference Filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC. (Mortensen, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
28 28 misc Declaration Fri 04/11 3:04 AM
Declaration re: Requesting Continuance of Status Hearing Filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC Related [+]. (Mortensen, James)
Related: [-] 12 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, April 10, 2025
27 27 trustee Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded (Chapter 11) (No PDF) Thu 04/10 2:17 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded (Chapter 11) Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA) Related [+]. (Mihelic, Kristin)
Related: [-] 11 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/10/2025 at 10:00 AM at UST-SA1, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-919-0527, PARTICIPANT CODE:2240227. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 6/9/2025. (JL)
Friday, April 04, 2025
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 04/04 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 04/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
25 25 misc Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF) Wed 04/02 4:17 PM
Notice to creditors - Notice of Hearing Motion By United States Trustee To Dismiss Or Convert Case Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declaration Of Alfred Cooper III In Support Thereof (BNC-PDF) (GD)
Related: [-]
24 24 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Wed 04/02 4:11 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 4/29/2025 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (GD)
Related: [-] 23 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA)
23 23 motion U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert (motion) Wed 04/02 2:50 PM
U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 1112(b); Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Alfred Cooper III in Support Thereof; along with Notice of Motion and Proof of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA). (Ng, Queenie)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 22, 2025
22 22 notice Notice Sat 03/22 11:30 AM
Notice Scheduling And Case Management Conference Filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC Related [+]. (Mortensen, James)
Related: [-] 12 Order Setting Scheduling And Case Management Conference - Hearing To Be Held On April 22, 2025 at 11:00 a.m., Rm 5B Via ZoomGov, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Ronald Reagan Federal Building, 411 W. Fourth Street, SAnta Ana, CA 92701. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #1 ) Signed on 3/14/2025 (GD),20 Notice of Status and Scheduling Conference Filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC (RE: related document(s)12 Order Setting Scheduling And Case Management Conference - Hearing To Be Held On April 22, 2025 at 11:00 a.m., Rm 5B Via ZoomGov, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Ronald Reagan Federal Building, 411 W. Fourth Street, SAnta Ana, CA 92701. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc1 ) Signed on 3/14/2025 (GD)). (Mortensen, James) - See docket entry no.: [ 21 ] for corrections Modified on 3/21/2025 (GD)., 21 Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Correct Case Number Format. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE A NOTICE OF ERRATA WITH THE PROPER CAPTION. THIS DOCUMENT IS A NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE - YOU HAVE NOTICE TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE (RE: related document(s)20 Notice filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC) (GD)
Friday, March 21, 2025
21 21 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Fri 03/21 9:52 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Correct Case Number Format. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE A NOTICE OF ERRATA WITH THE PROPER CAPTION. THIS DOCUMENT IS A NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE - YOU HAVE NOTICE TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE Related [+] (GD)
Related: [-] 20 Notice filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC
Thursday, March 20, 2025
20 20 notice Notice Thu 03/20 6:06 PM
Notice of Status and Scheduling Conference Filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC Related [+]. (Mortensen, James)
Related: [-] 12 Order Setting Scheduling And Case Management Conference - Hearing To Be Held On April 22, 2025 at 11:00 a.m., Rm 5B Via ZoomGov, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Ronald Reagan Federal Building, 411 W. Fourth Street, SAnta Ana, CA 92701. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #1 ) Signed on 3/14/2025 (GD)
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
19 19 court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Tue 03/18 7:30 PM
Receipt of Photocopies Fee - $23.50 by RS. Receipt Number 61002240. (admin)
Related: [-]
18 18 court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Tue 03/18 7:30 PM
Receipt of Certification Fee - $12.00 by RS. Receipt Number 61002240. (admin)
Related: [-]
17 17 court Request for a Certified Copy (fee) (Internal user) Tue 03/18 12:07 PM
Request for a Certified Copy Fee Amount $12. Related [+] (RS)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC
Monday, March 17, 2025
16 16 misc Request for special notice Mon 03/17 6:49 PM
Request for special notice and Notice of Appearance Filed by Creditor Smarter Capital Investments, LLC. (Engel, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Sunday, March 16, 2025
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 03/16 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 03/16 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 03/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Friday, March 14, 2025
13 13 court Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) Fri 03/14 12:37 PM
Hearing Set Status Conference Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 4/22/2025 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC
12 12 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 03/14 12:36 PM
Order Setting Scheduling And Case Management Conference - Hearing To Be Held On April 22, 2025 at 11:00 a.m., Rm 5B Via ZoomGov, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Ronald Reagan Federal Building, 411 W. Fourth Street, SAnta Ana, CA 92701. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/14/2025 (GD)
Related: [-] 1
11 11 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1) Fri 03/14 11:28 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/10/2025 at 10:00 AM at UST-SA1, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-919-0527, PARTICIPANT CODE:2240227. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 6/9/2025. (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
10 10 misc Addendum to Vol Pet Thu 03/13 6:35 PM
Addendum to voluntary petition Amended Petition Filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC. (Mortensen, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 03/12 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/12/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (VAN-197) (BNC)
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 03/12 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/12/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC)
7 7 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 03/12 5:01 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Document filed without electronic /s/ or holographic signature. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER SIGNATURES. Related [+] (TS)
Related: [-] 5 Addendum to Vol Pet filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC
6 6 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Atty for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Wed 03/12 3:08 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC Related [+]. (Mortensen, James)
Related: [-] Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn)
5 5 misc Addendum to Vol Pet Wed 03/12 2:56 PM
Addendum to voluntary petition Amended Petition Filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC. (Mortensen, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
4 4 misc Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (manual - ccdn) (BNC) Mon 03/10 10:15 AM
Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) Related [+] (TS)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC
3 3 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 03/10 10:11 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Petition was filed as complete, but schedules or statements are deficient. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE THE DEFICIENT DOCUMENTS. Related [+] (TS)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC
2 2 court Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (VAN-197) Mon 03/10 10:10 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC). (TS)
Related: [-]
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Mon 03/10 10:14 AM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Related [+] Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) (Missing Electronic /s/ or Holographic Signature) due 3/24/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 3/24/2025. (TS)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Corto II, LLC
Saturday, March 08, 2025
1 1 47 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sat 03/08 2:12 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Corto II, LLC (Mortensen, James)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sat 03/08 2:18 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:8:25-bk-10597] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58131935. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1