Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:25-mb-05633
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Terminated:Feb 07, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 09, 2025 12:36 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Search Warrant (1)
Terminated: 02/07/2025


Docket last updated: 03/09/2025 1:26 AM MST
Friday, February 07, 2025
1 1 SEARCH WARRANT ISSUED for located at Ssgt Alexander Young's PayPal Holdings, Inc. PayPal account, Ryan DeJoe appearing for USA/USAO# 2025R01493. (KAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit