Kentucky Eastern District Court
Case #: 5:25-cr-00002
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 09, 2025 3:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Kendall Glenn Hacker (1)
Represented By
Pam Ledgewood
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Emily K. Greenfield, AUSA
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Edky
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/30/2025 9:04 PM EDT
Friday, January 03, 2025
Conflict Check run. (KMP)
Related: [-]
*** FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS OF Judge Danny C. Reeves to review: re1 Notice of Intent and MOTION for Arraignment by USA filed as to Kendall Glenn Hacker (KMP)
Related: [-]
1 1 2 pgs NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE INFORMATION AND MOTION FOR ARRAIGNMENT by USA as to Kendall Glenn Hacker. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order
3 3 2 pgs ORDER as to Kendall Glenn Hacker (1): It is ORDERED that the1 Motion for Arraignment is GRANTED. ARRAIGNMENT set for 2/7/2025 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/3/2025. (KM)cc: COR,USM,USP,D and Pam Ledgewood by US mail (KM).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/3/2025) USM Receipt
Friday, February 07, 2025
CJA Appointment of Attorney for Kendall Glenn Hacker. The Clerk ENTERED the representation and appointment in the eVoucher system for Pam Ledgewood. (STC)
Related: [-]
4 4 6 pgs INFORMATION as to Kendall Glenn Hacker (1) count(s) 1. (STC)
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kendall Glenn Hacker (STC)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs MINUTE ENTRY for ARRAIGNMENT & REARRAIGNMENT as to Kendall Glenn Hacker held on 2/7/2025 before District Judge Danny C Reeves: Pam Ledgewood appeared as APPOINTED CJA counsel of record. Waiver of indictment and Information filed; Dft states true name; financial affidavit filed; dft qualifies; Pam Ledgewood appointed; dft formally arraigned, advised of rights; dft pleads GUILTY to information; plea agreement filed; transcript deemed written findings; Court orders PSR; dft released on bond, conditions of release; SENTENCING set for 5/8/2025 at 1:00 PM in LEXINGTON before District Judge Danny C Reeves. (Court Reporter Lauren Gootee.) (STC)cc: COR,USM,USP,D
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Kendall Glenn Hacker (STC)
Related: [-]
8 8 8 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to Kendall Glenn Hacker. Plea agreement returned to USA. cc: COR,USP (STC)
Related: [-]
9 9 4 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Kendall Glenn Hacker. Signed by District Judge Danny C Reeves on 2/7/2025. (STC)cc: COR,USM,USP
Related: [-]
10 10 4 pgs SENTENCING ORDER as to Kendall Glenn Hacker. Signed by District Judge Danny C Reeves on 2/7/2025. (STC)cc: COR,USP
Related: [-]