Kentucky Western District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-00139
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 3:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Stacy Allen Taylor (1)
Represented By
Mark J. O'Brien
O'Brien Hatfield, PA
contact info
Chastity R. Beyl
Western Kentucky Federal Community Defender, Inc.
contact info
Timothy Todd Anderson, Sr.
O'Brien Hatfield, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Corinne E. Keel (USA)
U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville
contact info

GPO Mar 07 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/6/2025 as to Stacy Allen Taylor re 53 Letter. Defendant Taylor's letter (DE 53) will not be considered by the Court and will be forwarded to counsel. cc: Counsel, Defendant (SMJ)

Docket last updated: 03/10/2025 3:42 AM EDT
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Seal 1 (1) counts 1, 2-3, 4-7. (DLW)
Related: [-]
2 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DLW)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Corinne E. Keel (USA) appearing for USA. (DLW)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Seal 1. (DLW)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 11/21/2023 granting4 Motion to Seal Case as to Seal 1 (1). (DLW)
Related: [-]
6 6 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT re1 Indictment. (DLW)
Related: [-]
7 7 Sealed Document (DLW)
Related: [-]