Council on American-Islamic Relations New York et al v. City Of New York et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Naomi Reice Buchwald |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-01936 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2025 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 4:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
City Of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
New York Police Department Officers John Doe #1 - 10
|
|
Defendant
Sergeant Joseph M. Spalding
|
|
Defendant
Assistant Chief Ruel R. Stephenson
|
|
Plaintiff
Zarmeen Azam
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Council on American-Islamic Relations New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shajnin Howlader
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER granting7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint,. Application granted. SO ORDERED. City Of New York answer due 6/2/2025. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/8/2025) (sgz) |
|
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint and Jury Demand, Individual Practices of Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald, and ECF Rules and Instructions served on Assistant Chief at Patrol Ruel R. Stephenson on March 18, 2025. Service was accepted by Patrol Officer Amoresano, Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Zarmeen Azam, Council on American-Islamic Relations New York, Shajnin Howlader..(Mansoor, Hafsa) |
|
9 | 9
![]() AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint and Jury Demand, Individual Practices of Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald, and ECF Rules and Instructions served on Sergeant Joseph M. Spalding on March 14, 2025. Service was accepted by Sgt. Rosario, Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Zarmeen Azam, Council on American-Islamic Relations New York, Shajnin Howlader..(Mansoor, Hafsa) |
|
8 | 8
![]() AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint and Jury Demand, Individual Rules of Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald, and ECF Rules and Instructions served on City of New York on March 13, 2025. Service was accepted by Adam Goebler, Employee Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Zarmeen Azam, Council on American-Islamic Relations New York, Shajnin Howlader..(Mansoor, Hafsa) |
|
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jessica Ochoa dated 4/1/2025. Document filed by City Of New York..(Ochoa, Jessica) |
|
Tuesday, March 11, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York, Joseph M. Spalding, Ruel R. Stephenson. (vf) |
|
Monday, March 10, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, Assistant Chief at Patrol Ruel R. Stephenson, Sergeant Joseph M. Spalding, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Council on American-Islamic Relations New York, Zarmeen Azam, Shajnin Howlader..(Wilson, Ogilvie) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 03/10 3:23 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 03/10 3:23 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 03/10 3:23 PM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 03/10 3:27 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ogilvie Andrew Fraser Wilson to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Request for Issuance of Summons cannot be issued for the party requested because it does not identify the party subject to service. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(A) and FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(B) : a summons must name the parties and be directed to the defendant. Once the party has been identified, the filing party may request a summons at that time. Re-file the document with named defendants using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp) |
||
Sunday, March 09, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hafsa S. Mansoor on behalf of Council on American-Islamic Relations New York, Zarmeen Azam, Shajnin Howlader..(Mansoor, Hafsa) |
|
3 | 3
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, Assistant Chief at Patrol Ruel R. Stephenson, Sergeant Joseph M. Spalding, New York Police Department Officers John Doe #1 - 10, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Council on American-Islamic Relations New York, Zarmeen Azam, Shajnin Howlader..(Wilson, Ogilvie) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wilson, Ogilvie) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against City Of New York, New York Police Department Officers John Doe #1 - 10, Joseph M. Spalding, Ruel R. Stephenson. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30735902)Document filed by Council on American-Islamic Relations New York, Shajnin Howlader, Zarmeen Azam..(Wilson, Ogilvie) |