Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:25-mj-00160
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 3:13 AM EDT
Defendant
Ricardo Javier Pizzali (1)
Represented By
Matthew Cox
Moore, Christoff & Siddiqui, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christopher Luis Galarza
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/10/2025 3:39 AM EDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
Initial Appearance/Status Conference set for 4/22/2025 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. (lgue, )
Related: [-]
1 1 INFORMATION as to Ricardo Javier Pizzali (1) count(s) 1, 2. (lgue, )
Related: [-]
3 3 Consent MOTION for Protective Order covering surveillance video materials by USA as to Ricardo Javier Pizzali. (Galarza, Christopher)
Related: [-]