Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Daryl F Bloom
Case #: 1:25-cv-00432
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
9 9 misc Transcript (Social Security Case) Tue 04/29 2:03 PM
Transcript from the Social Security Administration of entire record of proceedings.(Rill, Abby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Court Transcript Index,
Att: 2 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable,
Att: 3 Payment Documents and Decisions,
Att: 4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices,
Att: 5 Non Disability Related Development,
Att: 6 Disability Related Development Part 1,
Att: 7 Disability Related Development Part 2,
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1,
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2,
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3,
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 4
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/29 1:38 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Leland Dudek. Plaintiff Brief due by 5/29/2025.(Rill, Abby)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
7 7 misc Consents to Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate Judge in Direct Assignment Cases Thu 03/20 12:27 PM
CONSENTS to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2024-04. (jkc)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent Form Sent (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) Thu 03/20 8:37 AM
CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Susan Lee Delea, Leland Dudek YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Scranton Operations Supervisor, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 4/21/2025 (kjn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Tue 03/11 7:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Abby Elizabeth Rill on behalf of Leland Dudek. (Rill, Abby)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
4 4 order Standing Order 2022-26 in Social Security Appeals Mon 03/10 1:38 PM
STANDING ORDER 2022-26 in Social Security Appeals. (kjn)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/10 1:35 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court will notify the Commissioner of the commencement of the action by transmitting a Notice of Electronic Filing to the appropriate office within the Social Security Administrations Office of General Counsel and to the United States Attorney. Signed by Chief MJ Daryl F. Bloom on March 10, 2025. (kjn)
Related: [-]
service Service Made Electronically-SSA Cases Mon 03/10 1:36 PM
Service Made Electronically - Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. Section 405(g), and the Court's Standing Order 2022-26, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Court's CM/ECF system notifying the Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney for the Middle District of Pennsylvania of the commencement of this action. No summons shall issue. (kjn)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 09, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/10 9:45 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Susan Lee Delea.(aaa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/10 9:45 AM
COMPLAINT against Leland Dudek lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Susan Lee Delea.(aaa) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/10/2025) (aaa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet