South Carolina District Court
Judge:David C Norton
Case #: 2:25-cv-01471
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 5:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics Americas, LLC
Plaintiff
Arthur Middleton
Represented By
S Scott Bluestein
Bluestein Law Firm PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
8 8 order Scheduling Order Wed 05/07 10:57 AM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/9/2025, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/10/2025, Rule 26 Report due by 7/10/2025, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/28/2025, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/18/2025, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/20/2025, Discovery due by 2/9/2026, Motions in Limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 3/9/2026, Jury Selection Deadline 4/1/2026, Mediation Due by 3/31/2026. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 05/07/2025. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
7 7 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 04/29 4:37 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics Americas, LLC.(Hines, Julius)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 04/29 4:36 PM
ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint by Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics Americas, LLC.(Hines, Julius)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
5 5 4 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/10 2:19 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics Americas, LLC, filed by Arthur Middleton. Service due by 6/9/2025 (Bluestein, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 03/10 10:20 AM
Summons Issued as to Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics Americas, LLC. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 03/10 10:19 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Arthur Middleton.(hcor, )
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/10 10:17 AM
COMPLAINT against Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics Americas, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12311739.), filed by Arthur Middleton. Service due by 6/5/2025(hcor, )
Related: [-]