New York Southern District Court
Judge:Naomi Reice Buchwald
Case #: 1:25-cv-01962
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Cozy Comfort Company LLC
Plaintiff
FJerry, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum
Rothwell, Figg, Ernst & Manbeck, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
12 12 respm Response to Motion Mon 05/05 12:17 PM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum dated May 5, 2025 re:11 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Mikhail A. Shah, Esq. dated April 30, 2025. . Document filed by FJerry, LLC..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
11 11 motion Leave to File Document Wed 04/30 3:10 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Mikhail A. Shah, Esq. dated April 30, 2025. Document filed by Cozy Comfort Company LLC..(Shah, Mikhail)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 03/26 11:19 AM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Application granted. So ordered. Cozy Comfort Company LLC answer due 5/1/2025. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/26/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 03/26 10:05 AM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum dated March 26, 2025. Document filed by FJerry, LLC..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/21 4:06 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Cozy Comfort Company LLC served on 3/11/2025, answer due 4/1/2025. Service was accepted by Gregory Sitrick, Attorney. Document filed by FJerry, LLC..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
7 7 1 pgs misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted Tue 03/11 10:49 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 03/11 10:47 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cozy Comfort Company LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 03/11 10:45 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 03/11 10:45 AM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 03/11 10:45 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
5 5 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney Mon 03/10 12:36 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/10 12:34 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by FJerry, LLC..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/10 12:32 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to COZY COMFORT COMPANY LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by FJerry, LLC..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/10 12:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/10 12:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Cozy Comfort Company LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30739219)Document filed by FJerry, LLC..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A - Copyright Registration,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit B - Infringing Work