Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Susan E Schwab
Case #: 1:25-cv-00439
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 6:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Tuominen Andrea
Represented By
Sonya Kivisto
Administrative Office Of Pa. Courts
contact info
Defendant
Chief Clerk Davin Halland
Represented By
Sonya Kivisto
Administrative Office Of Pa. Courts
contact info
Defendant
Michael F. Krimmel
Represented By
Sonya Kivisto
Administrative Office Of Pa. Courts
contact info
Defendant
Deputy Steven Rothermel
Represented By
Sonya Kivisto
Administrative Office Of Pa. Courts
contact info
Defendant
Chief Judge Debra Todd
Represented By
Sonya Kivisto
Administrative Office Of Pa. Courts
contact info
Plaintiff
Lirong Xu
354 Waterloo Blvd., Unit 204
Exton, PA 19341


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
47 47 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Wed 04/30 11:11 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re46 Plaintiff's Emergency MOTION to Vacate Fraudulent Orders Under, Compel Production of Electronic Filing Records, and Reassert Plaintiff's Sovereign Right to Oversee Case Management filed by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
46 46 motion Vacate Wed 04/30 11:09 AM
Plaintiff's Emergency MOTION to Vacate Fraudulent Orders Under, Compel Production of Electronic Filing Records, and Reassert Plaintiff's Sovereign Right to Oversee Case Management by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
45 45 respm Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 04/30 11:02 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit J
44 44 motion Summary Judgment Wed 04/30 10:59 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
43 43 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/23 1:27 PM
ORDER - Lirong Xu, on or before May 7, 2025, shall file a brief in opposition to the motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.7, Debra Todd, Tuominen Andrea, Steven Rothermel, Davin Halland, and Michael F. Krimmel may file a reply brief within 14 days of being served with a copy of Lirong Xu's brief in opposition. All briefs must conform to the requirements of Local Rule 7.8. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 4/23/25. (ae)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
42 42 misc Document Filed Tue 04/22 12:04 PM
Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service for docket entries 32-41 by Lirong Xu. (ll)
Related: [-]
41 41 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Tue 04/22 11:58 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re40 MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REJECT CLERK'S APRIL 9, 2025 CONSENT FORM TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE AS PROCEDURALLY IMPROPER, FRAUDULENTLY DELAYING, AND LEGALLY MEANINGLESS filed by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
40 40 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/22 11:56 AM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REJECT CLERK'S APRIL 9, 2025 CONSENT FORM TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE AS PROCEDURALLY IMPROPER, FRAUDULENTLY DELAYING, AND LEGALLY MEANINGLESS by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
39 39 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Tue 04/22 11:52 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re38 PLAINTIFF ' S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST THE CLERK OFCOURT AND DEFENSE COUNSEL FOR FRAUD ON THE COURT,COLLUSION, AND PROCEDURAL MISCONDUCT filed by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Sanctions Tue 04/22 11:49 AM
PLAINTIFF ' S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST THE CLERK OFCOURT AND DEFENSE COUNSEL FOR FRAUD ON THE COURT,COLLUSION, AND PROCEDURAL MISCONDUCT by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Document Filed Tue 04/22 11:45 AM
PLAINTIFF ' S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF FORMAL REQUEST FOR AN EVIDENTIARY HEARI G BEFORE A DISTRICT JUDGE by Lirong Xu.36 Request. (ll)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Request (Do not use if you are filing a motion or requesting default; see default events below) Tue 04/22 11:43 AM
PLAINTIFF 'S FORMAL REQUEST FOR AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING BEFORE A DISTRICT JUDGE by Lirong Xu. (ll)
Related: [-]
35 35 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Tue 04/22 11:38 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re34 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF METADATA ANDCERTIFIED COPIES OF DEFENDANTS' APRIL 9, 2025 ELECTRONICFILINGS filed by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Compel Discovery Tue 04/22 11:36 AM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF METADATA ANDCERTIFIED COPIES OF DEFENDANTS' APRIL 9, 2025 ELECTRONICFILINGS by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Tue 04/22 11:34 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re32 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' APRIL 9, 2025 FILINGSFOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH FED. R. CIV. P. 11(a) AND.LOCAL RULE5.7 filed by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Strike Tue 04/22 11:31 AM
MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' APRIL 9, 2025 FILINGSFOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH FED. R. CIV. P. 11(a) AND.LOCAL RULE5.7 by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
31 31 respm Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Wed 04/16 12:36 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Debra Todd, Tuominen Andrea, Steven Rothermel, Davin Halland, Michael F. Krimmel.(Kivisto, Sonya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 10, 2025
30 30 motion Compel Thu 04/10 11:36 AM
MOTION to Compel filed by Lirong Xu.(aaa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
29 29 misc Consent Form Sent (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) Wed 04/09 2:46 PM
CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Tuominen Andrea, Davin Halland, Michael F. Krimmel, Steven Rothermel, Debra Todd, Lirong Xu YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Scranton Operations Supervisor, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 5/9/2025 (ae)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Wed 04/09 12:27 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Debra Todd, Tuominen Andrea, Steven Rothermel, Davin Halland, Michael F. Krimmel.(Kivisto, Sonya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) H
27 27 motion Dismiss Wed 04/09 12:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Debra Todd, Tuominen Andrea, Steven Rothermel, Davin Halland, Michael F. Krimmel.(Kivisto, Sonya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
26 26 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Wed 04/09 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sonya Kivisto on behalf of Debra Todd, Tuominen Andrea, Steven Rothermel, Davin Halland, Michael F. Krimmel (Kivisto, Sonya)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
25 25 service Certificate of Service Thu 03/27 11:13 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lirong Xu re24 Brief in Support,21 Notice,19 MOTION EMERGENCY MOTION TO ADDRESS JUDICIAL INACTION AND STAY STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS DUE TO PROCEDURAL VIOLATIONS AND RETALIATORY ORDERS,23 MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CORRECT FRAUDULENT MODIFICATION OF CLAIMED DAMAGES AND TO REASSIGN CASE TO A DISTRICT JUDGE,22 Brief In Support to Plaintiffs NOTICE to Void Order,20 Brief in Support (ll)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Thu 03/27 11:03 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re23 MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CORRECT FRAUDULENT MODIFICATION OF CLAIMED DAMAGES AND TO REASSIGN CASE TO A DISTRICT JUDGE filed by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/27 10:59 AM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CORRECT FRAUDULENT MODIFICATION OF CLAIMED DAMAGES AND TO REASSIGN CASE TO A DISTRICT JUDGE by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Document Filed Thu 03/27 10:54 AM
Brief In Support to21 Plaintiffs NOTICE to Void Order by Lirong Xu. (ll)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice (Other) - Do not use this event if this is a Notice of Appeal Thu 03/27 10:52 AM
Plaintiffs NOTICE to Void Order by Lirong Xu (ll)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Thu 03/27 10:45 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re19 MOTION EMERGENCY MOTION TO ADDRESS JUDICIAL INACTION AND STAY STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS DUE TO PROCEDURAL VIOLATIONS AND RETALIATORY ORDERS filed by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/27 10:41 AM
EMERGENCY MOTION TO ADDRESS JUDICIAL INACTION AND STAY STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS DUE TO PROCEDURAL VIOLATIONS AND RETALIATORY ORDERS by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Certificate of Service Thu 03/27 10:38 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lirong Xu re10 Brief in Support,5 MOTION to Disqualify Judge,12 Brief in Support,4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction,9 Brief in Support,7 Jury Demand,11 MOTION to Compel,8 Memorandum of Law,16 Brief in Support,15 MOTION to Clarify (ll)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/21 10:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lirong Xu. Tuominen Andrea served on 3/19/2025, answer due 4/9/2025; Davin Halland served on 3/19/2025, answer due 4/9/2025; Michael F. Krimmel served on 3/19/2025, answer due 4/9/2025; Steven Rothermel served on 3/19/2025, answer due 4/9/2025; Debra Todd served on 3/19/2025, answer due 4/9/2025. (ll)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Fri 03/21 10:43 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re15 MOTION to Clarify Judge's Signature Authorization, to Address Procedural Fraud Against Pro Se Litigant, and to Affirm Plaintiff's Right to a Timely Response Under Rule 12(a) filed by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Clarify Fri 03/21 10:42 AM
MOTION to Clarify Judge's Signature Authorization, to Address Procedural Fraud Against Pro Se Litigant, and to Affirm Plaintiff's Right to a Timely Response Under Rule 12(a) by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Fri 03/21 10:31 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re13 MOTION To Require Color Copies of Filed Documents filed by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/21 10:30 AM
MOTION To Require Color Copies of Filed Documents by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
12 12 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Mon 03/17 10:53 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re11 MOTION to Compel filed by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Compel Mon 03/17 10:47 AM
MOTION to Compel by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Mon 03/17 10:40 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re5 MOTION to Disqualify Judge filed by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Mon 03/17 10:37 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Mon 03/17 10:33 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Lirong Xu re7 Jury Demand. (ll)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Jury Demand Mon 03/17 10:33 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lirong Xu. (ll)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order Fri 03/14 3:01 PM
ORDER - Xu shall, within 90 days of the date he filed the complaint, serve the summons and the complaint on the defendants in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, or obtain a waiver of service from the defendants, and Xu shall file a return of service within 90 days of the date he filed the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 3/14/25. (ae)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
5 5 motion Disqualify Judge Wed 03/12 9:39 AM
MOTION to Disqualify Judge by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
utility ADI Receipt Entry Tue 03/11 11:26 AM
Receipt of payment from LIRONG XU in the amount of $405.00 for Civil Filing Fee- Non-Prisoner. Transaction posted on 3/10/2025. Receipt number 111103397 processed by AA. (jjs)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
4 4 motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 03/10 2:19 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Lirong Xu.(ll)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Pro Se Letter issued - MJ IS PRESIDING JUDGE Mon 03/10 2:18 PM
PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (ll)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Excerpts from Local Rules
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 03/10 1:58 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO PLAINTIFF VIA U.S. MAIL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (ll)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/10 1:57 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lirong Xu.(ll) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/10/2025) (ll). (ll)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Att: 2 (3/10/2025) Exhibit(s)
misc Docket Annotation Mon 03/10 4:22 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Filing Fee Paid (ll)
Related: [-]