Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Judge:Edward L Morris
Case #: 4:25-ap-04036
Nature of Suit498 null
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2025

Debtor
Pivotal Med Supply, LLC
2010 E. Continental Blvd. Suite F
Southlake, TX 76092
Represented By
Colin A Thakkar
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Richard R Thames
Thames Markey
contact info
Richard G Grant
Cm Law PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Defendant
Lance Canington
Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete 200 West Forsyth Street Suite 1700
Jacksonville, FL 32202
Represented By
Colin A Thakkar
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Defendant
Shaun Gyger
Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete 200 W Forsyth Street Suite 1700
Jacksonville, FL 32202
Represented By
Colin A Thakkar
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Defendant
Brian Kelly
2840 Woodlake Drive
Tyler, TX 75701
Represented By
Colin A Thakkar
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Defendant
Traci Lavender
Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete 200 West Forsyth Street Suite 1700
Jacksonville, FL 32202
Represented By
Colin A Thakkar
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Defendant
Johnny Mendoza
Represented By
Colin A Thakkar
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Defendant
Michael Morello
Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete 200 West Forsyth Street Suite 1700
Jacksonville, FL 32202
Represented By
Colin A Thakkar
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Poole
Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete 200 West Forsyth Street Suite 1700
Jacksonville, FL 32202
Represented By
Colin A Thakkar
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Defendant
Mary Shaw
3702 S. Fitzhugh Ave
Dallas, TX 75210
Represented By
Colin A Thakkar
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Defendant
Ari Virtanen
Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete 200 West Forsyth Street Suite 1700
Jacksonville, FL 32202
Represented By
Colin A Thakkar
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Defendant
Total Ancillary Management, LLC
Gray Robinson PA 333 S.E. 2nd Avenue Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Bryan James Yarnell
Gray Robinson PA
contact info
Steven J Solomon
Grayrobinson, PA
contact info
Fabian A. Ruiz
Grayrobinson, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Pivotal Med Supply, LLC
2010 E. Continental Blvd. Suite F
Southlake, TX 76092
Represented By
Colin A Thakkar
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Richard G. Grant
Cm Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Next Science, LLC
10550 Deerwood Park Blvd Suite 300
Jacksonville, FL 32256
Represented By
Robert A. Simon
Whitaker Chalk Swindle & Schwartz, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
70 70 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 05/16 11:21 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 05/16/2025. (Admin.) (5 pgs)
Related: [-] 68 Agreed Order Extending Next Science, LLC's and Debtor, Pivotal Med Supply, LLC's Deadlines to Respond to The Debtor's Objection to Next Science, LLC's Proof of Claim and to Next Science, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims in Adversary Proceeding NO. 25-04036 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(57169789,'Next_Science,_LLC_v_Canington_et_al',67);">67 Motion to extend time. Entered on 5/14/2025. (Wright Jr., Timothy)
Thursday, May 15, 2025
69 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/30/2025 before Judge Edward L. Morris (285 pages) RE: Motion for Remand (#47). THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 08/13/2025. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. Related [+]. Transcript to be made available to the public on 08/13/2025.
Related: [-] 64 Hearing held and continued to 9:30 a.m., 5/27/2025 re:Motion for remand filed by Plaintiff Next Science, LLC. Continued hearing to be held on 5/27/2025 at 09:30 AM Ft. Worth, Judge Morris Ctrm. for47 ,hling, Kathy
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
68 68 order Extend/Shorten time Wed 05/14 3:07 PM
Agreed Order Extending Next Science, LLC's and Debtor, Pivotal Med Supply, LLC's Deadlines to Respond to The Debtor's Objection to Next Science, LLC's Proof of Claim and to Next Science, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims in Adversary Proceeding NO. 25-04036 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(57169789,'Next_Science,_LLC_v_Canington_et_al',67);">67 Motion to extend time. Entered on 5/14/2025. (Wright Jr., Timothy) (3 pgs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
67 67 motion Extend/Shorten time Tue 05/13 12:01 PM
Motion to extend time to Debtor's Response to Motion to Dismiss Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Next Science, LLC, Counter-Defendant Next Science, LLC (Simon, Robert) (9 pgs; 2 docs)
Related: [-] 52 Answer to complaint, Counterclaim,63 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding,65 Motion for leave
Att: 1 Proposed Order