Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:David C Joseph
Referred: David J Ayo
Case #: 6:25-cv-00292
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 3:50 AM CDT
Defendant
North Light Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By
James L Donovan, Jr
Donovan & Lawler (met)
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeremy D Courville
Represented By
Demi Maria Dantin
Averill & Reaney Attorneys At Law
contact info
Brian Gerard Reaney, II
Averill & Reaney Attorneys At Law
contact info
Matthew J Averill
Averill & Reaney Attorneys At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Rhonda J Courville
Represented By
Demi Maria Dantin
Averill & Reaney Attorneys At Law
contact info
Brian Gerard Reaney, II
Averill & Reaney Attorneys At Law
contact info
Matthew J Averill
Averill & Reaney Attorneys At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
9 9 misc Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Tue 04/08 1:15 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by North Light Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Donovan, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/08 1:02 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by North Light Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corp for North Light Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Donovan, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Tue 04/08 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Complaint, sent to James L Donovan, Jr on behalf of North Light Specialty Insurance Co. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 4/22/2025. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Tue 04/08 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Complaint, sent to James L Donovan, Jr on behalf of North Light Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/22/2025. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/08 10:14 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by North Light Specialty Insurance Co.(Attorney James L Donovan, Jr added to party North Light Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Donovan, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
4 4 misc Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Tue 03/11 9:57 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rhonda J Courville, Jeremy D Courville. (aty,Averill, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Mon 03/10 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Complaint, sent to Matthew J Averill on behalf of Rhonda J Courville, Jeremy D Courville. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 3/24/2025. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Mon 03/10 2:38 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to North Light Specialty Insurance Co. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/10 1:28 PM
COMPLAINT against North Light Specialty Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6210947) filed by Jeremy Courville, Rhonda Courville.(Attorney Matthew J Averill added to party Jeremy Courville(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew J Averill added to party Rhonda Courville(pty:pla))(aty,Averill, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/10 2:36 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]