Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-15251

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Romero
Case #: 1:25-ap-01094
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Polsinelli PC
Represented By
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Simon E. Rodriguez, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Kevin S. Neiman
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
9 9 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Tue 04/22 11:37 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Polsinelli PC Answer Due 5/5/2025 Related [+]. (bw)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Monday, April 21, 2025
8 8 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 04/21 10:58 AM
Second Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Michael Schuster on behalf of Polsinelli PC Related [+]. (Schuster, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Friday, March 21, 2025
7 7 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Fri 03/21 2:11 PM
Order Granting Agreed Motion to Extend Time To Respond to Complaint Polsinelli PC Answer Due 4/21/2025 Related [+]. (sd)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
6 6 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Wed 03/19 1:51 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time To Respond to Complaint Filed by Michael Schuster on behalf of Polsinelli PC Related [+]. (Schuster, Michael) Modified on 3/20/2025 (sd)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
5 5 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 03/18 2:11 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Michael Schuster on behalf of Polsinelli PC. (Schuster, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Thu 03/06 4:33 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Polsinelli PC and National Registered Agents, Inc.; 3/6/25 Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 03/06 4:15 PM
Summons Issued on Polsinelli PC Answer Due 04/7/2025. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee Thu 03/06 4:14 PM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/06 4:13 PM
Adversary case 25-01094 Complaint by Simon E. Rodriguez against Polsinelli PC. Fee to be Deferred. Adversary Status Deadline 06/4/2025 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-]