T. A. Blackburn Law, PLLC et al v. We Serve Law LLC et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph A Marutollo |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-01355 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2025 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2025 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 5:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
Lexitas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alexander Vays
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
We Serve Law LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deposition Solutions, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Habermehl
|
|
Plaintiff
Tyrone Blackburn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
T. A. Blackburn Law, PLLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fari Murray
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
27 | 27
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tyrone Blackburn, Fari Murray, T. A. Blackburn Law, PLLC (Blackburn, Tyrone) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 04/25 5:29 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to close this case. The Clerk of the Court shall also terminate the motion at Dkt. No.26 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/25/2025. (EG) |
||
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Letter MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or, In The Alternative, For A Conference by Deposition Solutions, LLC, Lexitas, Alexander Vays, We Serve Law LLC. (Poli, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 04/24 11:52 PM
ORDER deferring ruling on26 - Plaintiffs shall respond to26 by 5 p.m. on April 25, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/24/2025. (JAM) |
||
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Summons Issued as to John Habermehl. (SG) |
|
order
~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 04/23 11:58 AM
ORDER: The amended complaint at Dkt. No.21 is deemed filed. Plaintiffs, however, shall file a request to update the caption by April 25, 2025, in light of Defendants' assertion that "We Serve Law LLC" is not a proper party to this action. See Dkt. No.23 at 1 n.1. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/23/2025. (EG) |
||
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Proposed Summons. Re21 Amended Complaint by Tyrone Blackburn, Fari Murray, T. A. Blackburn Law, PLLC (Blackburn, Tyrone) |
|
23 | 23
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss, and Letter of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' filing of the Amended Complaint 21 by Deposition Solutions, LLC, Lexitas, Alexander Vays, We Serve Law LLC. (Poli, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 04/22 9:57 PM
ORDER granting23 - Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss by May 22, 2025; Plaintiffs shall file their response in opposition to the motion to dismiss by June 5,2025; and Defendants shall file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss by June 12,2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/22/2025. (JAM) |
||
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Mon 04/21 8:58 AM
ORDER: Defendants shall file a letter indicating whether they oppose Plaintiffs' filing of an amended complaint by April 22, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/21/2025. (GWM) |
||
Saturday, April 19, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() EXHIBIT by Tyrone Blackburn, Fari Murray, T. A. Blackburn Law, PLLC. Related document:21 Amended Complaint filed by Fari Murray, T. A. Blackburn Law, PLLC, Tyrone Blackburn. (Blackburn, Tyrone) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
21 | 21
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lexitas, Alexander Vays, We Serve Law LLC, Deposition Solutions, LLC, John Habermehl, filed by T. A. Blackburn Law, PLLC, Tyrone Blackburn, Fari Murray. (Blackburn, Tyrone) |
|
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend1 Complaint, a brief extension of the current deadline to file the Plaintiffs' amended complaint--from today, Monday, April 14, 2025, to Friday, April 18, 2025 by Tyrone Blackburn, T. A. Blackburn Law, PLLC. (Blackburn, Tyrone) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
Mon 04/14 6:25 PM
ORDER granting20 . Plaintiffs shall file their motion for leave to file an amended complaint by April 18, 2025. Defendants shall file their response by April 25, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/14/2025. (GWM) |
||
Thursday, April 10, 2025 | ||
minutes
Pre Motion Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 04/10 6:13 PM
Minute entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo: a pre-motion conference was held on the record on April 10, 2025. All parties appeared. The Court first discussed Plaintiffs' request to strike portions of Defendants'15 letter and Plaintiffs' motion for sanctions, as raised in17 . Following that discussion, the Court denied Plaintiffs' request. The Court next discussed 15 . The Court set the following briefing schedule for Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss: Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss by May 15, 2025. Plaintiffs shall file their response in opposition to Defendants motion by May 29, 2025. Defendants shall file their reply, if any, by June 5, 2025. The parties are referred to Judge Marutollo's Individual Practices and Rules for guidelines on their anticipated filings. The Court further stayed all discovery pending resolution of Defendants' anticipated motion. Plaintiffs shall seek leave to amend their complaint by April 14, 2025. Plaintiffs' letter should identify and include the proper Defendants in that filing. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' request by April 21, 2025; Defendants shall indicate whether they consent to the filing of the amended complaint on procedural grounds and whether they still intend to move to dismiss the amended complaint. (FTR Log #4:17-4:38.) (GWM) |
||
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Ari Roytenberg on behalf of Lexitas, Alexander Vays, We Serve Law LLC (aty to be noticed) (Roytenberg, Ari) |
|
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie. (WV) |
|
17 | 17
![]() REPLY in Opposition re15 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document and Seeking Pre-Motion Conference , Order filed by Tyrone Blackburn, T. A. Blackburn Law, PLLC. (Blackburn, Tyrone) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 04/03 9:59 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A pre-motion conference will occur on April 10, 2025, at 4:15 p.m. in Courtroom 324 North before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. The parties should be prepared to discuss15 and17 , including the materiality of Defendants' allegations of Plaintiffs' alleged misconduct. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/3/2025. (EG) |
||
Wednesday, April 02, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lexitas, Alexander Vays, We Serve Law LLC identifying Other Affiliate Depo Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate DS Blocker, LLC, Other Affiliate Chronicle Bidco, Inc. for Lexitas, We Serve Law LLC. (Poli, Nicholas) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document and Seeking Pre-Motion Conference by Lexitas, Alexander Vays, We Serve Law LLC. (Poli, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
order
Order(Other)
Wed 04/02 7:06 PM
ORDER: Plaintiffs shall respond to15 by April 7, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/2/2025. (GWM) |
||
Tuesday, March 25, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Lexitas, Alexander Vays, We Serve Law LLC. (Poli, Nicholas) |
|
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by John Ansbro on behalf of Lexitas, Alexander Vays, We Serve Law LLC (aty to be noticed) (Ansbro, John) |
|
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Poli on behalf of Lexitas, Alexander Vays, We Serve Law LLC (aty to be noticed) (Poli, Nicholas) |
|
Monday, March 17, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by T. A. Blackburn Law, PLLC, Tyrone Blackburn. Alexander Vays waiver sent on 3/17/2025, answer due 5/16/2025. (Blackburn, Tyrone) |
|
10 | 10
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by T. A. Blackburn Law, PLLC, Tyrone Blackburn. We Serve Law LLC served on 3/17/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (Blackburn, Tyrone) |
|
9 | 9
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by T. A. Blackburn Law, PLLC, Tyrone Blackburn. Lexitas served on 3/12/2025, answer due 4/2/2025. (Blackburn, Tyrone) |
|
Tuesday, March 11, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held on May 21, 2025 at 11 a.m. in Courtroom 324 North before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. The parties must complete the attached proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order and file it on ECF no later than May 16, 2025. Plaintiff is directed to ensure that all Defendants are aware of this conference. Counsel with knowledge of the case must attend the conference; per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. The parties are directed to review this Court's Individual Practices and Rules in advance of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 3/11/2025. (EG) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
7 | 7
![]() This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Summons Issued as to Lexitas, We Serve Law LLC. (SDM) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (SDM) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/11 10:46 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM) |
||
misc
Quality Control Check - Summons
Tue 03/11 10:56 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following defendants: Alexander Vays, please submit summons. The event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (SDM) |
||
Monday, March 10, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by Tyrone Blackburn, T. A. Blackburn Law, PLLC (Blackburn, Tyrone) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by Tyrone Blackburn, T. A. Blackburn Law, PLLC (Blackburn, Tyrone) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by Tyrone Blackburn, T. A. Blackburn Law, PLLC (Blackburn, Tyrone) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Lexitas, Alexander Vays, We Serve Law LLC filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18838519 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by T. A. Blackburn Law, PLLC, Tyrone Blackburn. (Blackburn, Tyrone) |