Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Raymond A Jackson
Referred: Douglas E Miller
Case #: 2:25-cv-00141
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Case in other court:Chesapeake Circuit Court, CL21003990-00
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 6:46 AM EDT
Defendant
American Family RV, Inc.
353 Main Street PO Box 190
Smithfield, VA 23431
Represented By
Yevgeniy Konstantinovich Klinovskiy
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Soroush Nasser Moghaddassi
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman, P.C. (glen Allen)
contact info
Danielle Deanna Giroux
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Defendant
KZ, Inc.
Represented By
Yevgeniy Konstantinovich Klinovskiy
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Soroush Nasser Moghaddassi
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman, P.C. (glen Allen)
contact info
Danielle Deanna Giroux
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Glenn Beard
Represented By
James Ben Feinman
James B. Feinman Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Kerry Ann Beard
Represented By
James Ben Feinman
James B. Feinman Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 21, 2025
3 3 trial Exhibit Fri 03/21 4:50 PM
EXHIBIT by American Family RV, Inc., KZ, Inc...(Moghaddassi, Soroush)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Demurrer,
Att: 2 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Exhibit Motion Craving Oyer,
Att: 4 Exhibit Brief in Support of Demurrer,
Att: 5 Exhibit Brief in Support of Motion Craving Oyer,
Att: 6 Exhibit Motion to Compel
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
2 2 utility Mag Notice / Judge Information Tue 03/11 12:07 PM
Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 03/10 3:21 PM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-10052198.), filed by KZ, Inc., American Family RV, Inc..(Moghaddassi, Soroush)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit Order Granting Continuance,
Att: 6 Exhibit Order Granting MCO,
Att: 7 Exhibit Order Granting Continuance,
Att: 8 Exhibit Settlement Demand
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 03/11 12:05 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
Related: [-]