Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Susan E Schwab
Case #: 1:25-cv-00435
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 6:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Patrick K. Armstrong
Represented By
Michael A. Pipa
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Rolf E. Kroll
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Claire A. Murtha
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Defendant
Michael Corado
Represented By
Michael A. Pipa
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Rolf E. Kroll
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Claire A. Murtha
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Defendant
Derry Township
Represented By
Michael A. Pipa
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Rolf E. Kroll
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Claire A. Murtha
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Defendant
Dominic Giovanniello
Represented By
Michael A. Pipa
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Rolf E. Kroll
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Claire A. Murtha
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Defendant
Zachary Jackson
Represented By
Michael A. Pipa
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Rolf E. Kroll
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Claire A. Murtha
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Defendant
Michael H. Lanza
Represented By
Eric Wilson Sitarchuk
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Steven B. Davis, I
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Maria E Cosma
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
John K. Gisleson
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
John J. Marchioni
Represented By
Eric Wilson Sitarchuk
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Steven B. Davis, I
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Maria E Cosma
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
John K. Gisleson
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
Natalie Nutt
Represented By
Michael A. Pipa
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Rolf E. Kroll
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Claire A. Murtha
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Defendant
Selective Insurance Company
Represented By
Eric Wilson Sitarchuk
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Steven B. Davis, I
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Maria E Cosma
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
John K. Gisleson
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dennis Shearer
Represented By
Michael A. Pipa
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Rolf E. Kroll
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Claire A. Murtha
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Defendant
David Swartz
Represented By
Eric Wilson Sitarchuk
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Steven B. Davis, I
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Maria E Cosma
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
John K. Gisleson
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
Garth Warner
Represented By
Michael A. Pipa
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Rolf E. Kroll
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Claire A. Murtha
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Defendant
Carter Wyckoff
Represented By
Michael A. Pipa
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Rolf E. Kroll
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Claire A. Murtha
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Defendant
Richard Zmuda
Represented By
Michael A. Pipa
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Rolf E. Kroll
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Claire A. Murtha
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason R. Todd
223 Pineview Drive
Palmyra, PA 17078


Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
260 260 misc Notice (Do Not Use This Event if this is a Notice of Appeal) Mon 05/05 10:32 PM
NOTICE DEFENSE SHELL GAME AND ADVANCE CASE TO FINAL RULING , filed by Jason R. Todd.(Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
259 259 respm Statement of Facts Mon 05/05 1:30 PM
STATEMENT OF FACTS re252 MOTION to Clarify RICO Web of Liability ,256 Notice,258 Exhibit,,,254 Notice,,,,,,,,,, Praecipe to Issue Certification of Judgment,,,,,,,,,, Reply Brief,,,,,,,,,253 MOTION to Resolve Discovery Dispute SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DISCOVERY OF COMMUNICATIONS AND INTERNAL RECORDS ,255 Notice,257 Brief,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Reply Brief,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Jason R. Todd.(Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 04, 2025
258 258 misc Exhibit Sun 05/04 11:20 PM
EXHIBIT SWARTZ PHONE CALL TIME AND DATE ON AT&T CALL LOG - THE PHONE CALL HAPPENED by Jason R. Todd re252 MOTION to Clarify RICO Web of Liability ,251 Notice,256 Notice,248 Notice,242 Notice,241 Notice,254 Notice,,,,,,,,,, Praecipe to Issue Certification of Judgment,,,,,,,,,, Reply Brief,,,,,,,,,253 MOTION to Resolve Discovery Dispute SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DISCOVERY OF COMMUNICATIONS AND INTERNAL RECORDS ,244 Notice,246 Notice,247 Notice,240 Notice,243 MOTION to Clarify WAIVER OF SUMMONS TO SIGI? ,250 MOTION to Supplement CLARIFYING CORPORATE PARTY RESPONSIBILITY AND REAFFIRMING INTENT TO HOLD SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP, INC. ACCOUNTABLE ,255 Notice,245 Brief in Opposition,,,,,238 Service by Publication,249 Notice,257 Brief,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Reply Brief,,,,,,,,,,,,,239 Service by Publication. (Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
257 257 misc Brief Reply Brief Sun 05/04 10:48 AM
BRIEF by Jason R. Todd. , REPLY to Response to Motion re195 MOTION to Clarify SCOPE UNDER RULE 58(a) AND REQUEST FOR FINDINGS ON ENTERPRISE LIABILITY ,192 MOTION for Joinder The Vanguard Group, Inc. and Michael I. White, Esq., ,200 MOTION to Stay re192 MOTION for Joinder The Vanguard Group, Inc. and Michael I. White, Esq., ,181 MOTION to Amend/Correct178 MOTION to Certify MOTION for Damages MOTION to Clarify MOTION to Enforce,199 MOTION for Consideration MOTION to Intervene MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Reopen Case MOTION for Return of Property MOTION for Service by Publication MOTION to Sever MOTION to Strike198 Notice,189 MOTION to Enforce Judgment MOTION for Entry of Default MOTION to Expedite MOTION to Lift Stay MOTION for Order MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION to Substitute Party MOTION to Stay MOTION for Writ TO STOP ONGOING DAMAGES THAT THE COURT IS AWARE IS ONGOING ,202 MOTION to Stay re79 First MOTION to Amend/Correct78 Order Complaint ,192 MOTION for Joinder The Vanguard Group, Inc. and Michael I. White, Esq., ,181 MOTION to Amend/Correct178 MOTION to Certify MOT , filed by Jason R. Todd. Related document:195 MOTION to Clarify SCOPE UNDER RULE 58(a) AND REQUEST FOR FINDINGS ON ENTERPRISE LIABILITY filed by Jason R. Todd,192 MOTION for Joinder The Vanguard Group, Inc. and Michael I. White, Esq., filed by Jason R. Todd,200 MOTION to Stay re192 MOTION for Joinder The Vanguard Group, Inc. and Michael I. White, Esq., ,181 MOTION to Amend/Correct178 MOTION to Certify MOTION for Damages MOTION to Clarify MOTION to Enforce filed by Patrick K. Armstrong, Natalie Nutt, Carter Wyckoff, Michael Corado, Zachary Jackson, Dennis Shearer, Derry Township, Dominic Giovanniello, Richard Zmuda, Garth Warner,199 MOTION for Consideration MOTION to Intervene MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Reopen Case MOTION for Return of Property MOTION for Service by Publication MOTION to Sever MOTION to Strike198 Notice,189 MOTION to Enforce Judgment MOTION for Entry of Default MOTION to Expedite MOTION to Lift Stay MOTION for Order MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION to Substitute Party MOTION to Stay MOTION for Writ TO STOP ONGOING DAMAGES THAT THE COURT IS AWARE IS ONGOING filed by Jason R. Todd,202 MOTION to Stay re79 First MOTION to Amend/Correct78 Order Complaint ,192 MOTION for Joinder The Vanguard Group, Inc. and Michael I. White, Esq., ,181 MOTION to Amend/Correct178 MOTION to Certify MOT filed by Michael H. Lanza, Selective Insurance Company, David Swartz, John J. Marchioni.(Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 03, 2025
256 256 misc Notice (Do Not Use This Event if this is a Notice of Appeal) Sat 05/03 10:08 PM
NOTICE DEFENDANT LIABILITY, COORDINATION, AND EVIDENTIARY SUPPORT , filed by Jason R. Todd.(Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
255 255 misc Notice (Do Not Use This Event if this is a Notice of Appeal) Sat 05/03 9:39 PM
NOTICE Revised Damages $50M , filed by Jason R. Todd.(Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
254 254 misc Notice (Do Not Use This Event if this is a Notice of Appeal) Praecipe to Issue Certification of Judgment Reply Brief Sat 05/03 9:11 PM
NOTICE , PRAECIPE TO ISSUE CERTIFICATION OF JUDGMENT , REPLY to Response to Motion re204 MOTION to Lift Stay re157 Notice,96 Notice,121 Notice,77 Statement of Facts,79 First MOTION to Amend/Correct78 Order Complaint ,45 MOTION for Order Emergency emergency summary judgment, compel discovery comp, 200 MOTION to Stay re 192 MOTION for Joinder The Vanguard Group, Inc. and Michael I. White, Esq., , 181 MOTION to Amend/Correct 178 MOTION to Certify MOTION for Damages MOTION to Clarify MOTION to Enforce, 170 MOTION for Judgment MOTION FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION BASED ON PLAINTIFFS DISABILITY STATUS, BEHAVIORAL HEALTH PROTECTIONS, AND THE NECESSITY OF JUDICIAL EFFICIENCY TO PREVENT ONGOING IRREPARABLE HARM , 202 MOTION to Stay re 79 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 78 Order Complaint , 192 MOTION for Joinder The Vanguard Group, Inc. and Michael I. White, Esq., , 181 MOTION to Amend/Correct 178 MOTION to Certify MOT , filed by Jason R. Todd. Related document: 204 MOTION to Lift Stay re 157 Notice, 96 Notice, 121 Notice, 77 Statement of Facts, 79 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 78 Order Complaint , 45 MOTION for Order Emergency emergency summary judgment, compel discovery comp filed by Jason R. Todd, 200 MOTION to Stay re 192 MOTION for Joinder The Vanguard Group, Inc. and Michael I. White, Esq.,, 181 MOTION to Amend/Correct 178 MOTION to Certify MOTION for Damages MOTION to Clarify MOTION to Enforce filed by Patrick K. Armstrong, Natalie Nutt, Carter Wyckoff, Michael Corado, Zachary Jackson, Dennis Shearer, Derry Township, Dominic Giovanniello, Richard Zmuda, Garth Warner, 170 MOTION for Judgment MOTION FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION BASED ON PLAINTIFFS DISABILITY STATUS, BEHAVIORAL HEALTH PROTECTIONS, AND THE NECESSITY OF JUDICIAL EFFICIENCY TO PREVENT ONGOING IRREPARABLE HARM filed by Jason R. Todd, 202 MOTION to Stay re 79 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 78 Order Complaint, 192 MOTION for Joinder The Vanguard Group, Inc. and Michael I. White, Esq.,, 181 MOTION to Amend/Correct 178 MOTION to Certify MOT filed by Michael H. Lanza, Selective Insurance Company, David Swartz, John J. Marchioni.(Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
253 253 motion Resolve Discovery Dispute Sat 05/03 4:36 PM
MOTION to Resolve Discovery Dispute SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DISCOVERY OF COMMUNICATIONS AND INTERNAL RECORDS by Jason R. Todd.(Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
252 252 motion Clarify Sat 05/03 4:14 PM
MOTION to Clarify RICO Web of Liability by Jason R. Todd.(Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits List,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibits
Friday, May 02, 2025
251 251 misc Notice (Do Not Use This Event if this is a Notice of Appeal) Fri 05/02 11:20 PM
NOTICE CLARIFYING THAT DEFENSES ASSERTED BY SUBSIDIARIES ARE IDENTICAL TO THOSE AVAILABLE TO THE ENTIRETY OF SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP, INC. ENTERPR , filed by Jason R. Todd.(Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
250 250 motion Supplement Fri 05/02 9:16 PM
MOTION to Supplement CLARIFYING CORPORATE PARTY RESPONSIBILITY AND REAFFIRMING INTENT TO HOLD SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP, INC. ACCOUNTABLE by Jason R. Todd.(Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
249 249 misc Notice (Do Not Use This Event if this is a Notice of Appeal) Fri 05/02 5:08 PM
NOTICE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP, I , filed by Jason R. Todd.(Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
248 248 misc Notice (Do Not Use This Event if this is a Notice of Appeal) Fri 05/02 4:50 PM
NOTICE NOTICE CLARIFYING CORPORATE PARTY INTENT: SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP, INC. AND ITS EXECUTIVE OFFICERS , filed by Jason R. Todd.(Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
247 247 misc Notice (Do Not Use This Event if this is a Notice of Appeal) Fri 05/02 2:17 PM
NOTICE NOTICE REGARDING SELECTIVE DEFENDANTS SPLIT REPRESENTATION: DEMAND FOR CLARIFICATION OF CORPORATE ENTITY FILINGS , filed by Jason R. Todd.(Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
246 246 notice Notice (Other) - Do not use this event if this is a Notice of Appeal Fri 05/02 1:57 PM
NOTICE by Jason R. Todd re242 Notice,241 Notice,244 Notice,243 MOTION to Clarify WAIVER OF SUMMONS TO SIGI? ,245 Brief in Opposition,,,,, O ONE IS REPRESENTING SELECTIVE INSURANCE IN ITS CORPORATE CAPACITY SIGI (Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
245 245 respm Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Fri 05/02 1:03 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re209 MOTION for Consideration MASTER OMNIBUS SUBMISSION - organizes everything for Court and Defense ,224 MOTION to Amend/Correct Ominbus Motion ,212 MOTION for Joinder MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings MOTION to Lift Stay MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION to Resolve Discovery Dispute MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Service by Publication MOTION to Supplement MOTION for Writ SEC,DOJ, and Regulatory Referral ,220 MOTION to Clarify ,204 MOTION to Lift Stay re157 Notice,96 Notice,121 Notice,77 Statement of Facts,79 First MOTION to Amend/Correct78 Order Complaint ,45 MOTION for Order Emergency emergency summary judgment, compel discovery comp, 226 MOTION for Order Omnibus Motion , 206 MOTION to Clarify MOTION to Compel MOTION to Certify MOTION to Lift Stay MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Consideration , 243 MOTION to Clarify WAIVER OF SUMMONS TO SIGI? filed by John J. Marchioni, Michael H. Lanza, David Swartz, Selective Insurance Company.(Gisleson, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
244 244 misc Notice (Do Not Use This Event if this is a Notice of Appeal) Fri 05/02 11:06 AM
NOTICE SUPPLEMENTAL COURT REPORT REGARDING REPRESENTATION STATUS OF SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP, INC. SUPPLEMENTAL COURT REPORT REGARDING REPRESENTATION STATUS OF SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP, INC. , filed by Jason R. Todd.(Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement Summonsy,
Att: 2 Statement Notice
243 243 motion Clarify Fri 05/02 10:26 AM
MOTION to Clarify WAIVER OF SUMMONS TO SIGI? by Jason R. Todd.(Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
242 242 misc Notice (Do Not Use This Event if this is a Notice of Appeal) Fri 05/02 10:08 AM
NOTICE WHO IS REPRESENTING Selective Insuranace Group, Inc, (SIGI)? Please Clairify , filed by Jason R. Todd.(Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
241 241 notice Notice (Other) - Do not use this event if this is a Notice of Appeal Tue 04/29 1:42 AM
NOTICE by Jason R. Todd re204 MOTION to Lift Stay re157 Notice,96 Notice,121 Notice,77 Statement of Facts,79 First MOTION to Amend/Correct78 Order Complaint ,45 MOTION for Order Emergency emergency summary judgment, compel discovery comp SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DEFENSE COUNSEL MISCONDUCT AND RENEWED REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS UNDER RULE 11(c)(3) AND 28 U.S.C. § 1927 (Todd, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT A